This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/20/2021 at 14:11:16 (UTC).

CASHCALL -V- FRENCH

Case Summary

On 03/12/2018 CASHCALL filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against FRENCH. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2452

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CASHCALL INC

Defendant

FRENCH, MICHELLE

Assignee

WAHR FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Not Yet Classified

CONV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Assignee Attorney

Miele, Kenneth John

 

Court Documents

MEMO OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT WITH COSTS OF $55.00; CREDIT OF $0.00; INTEREST OF $2,322.45 FILED.

MEMO OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT WITH COSTS OF $55.00; CREDIT OF $0.00; INTEREST OF $2,322.45 FILED.

MEMO OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT WITH COSTS OF $55.00; CREDIT OF $0.00; INTEREST OF $2,322.45 FILED.

MEMO OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT WITH COSTS OF $55.00; CREDIT OF $0.00; INTEREST OF $2,322.45 FILED.

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. COPY FILED.

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. COPY FILED.

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. COPY FILED.

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. COPY FILED.

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT 1804

03/12/2018: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT 1804

MEMO OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT WITH COSTS OF $55.00;

03/12/2018: MEMO OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT WITH COSTS OF $55.00;

MEMO OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT WITH COSTS OF $55.00;

03/12/2018: MEMO OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT WITH COSTS OF $55.00;

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. COPY FILED.

03/12/2018: NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. COPY FILED.

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. COPY FILED.

03/12/2018: NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. COPY FILED.

COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED WITH COSTS IN THE A

10/18/2018: COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED WITH COSTS IN THE A

WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY.

10/25/2018: WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY.

Declaration for Lost Writ Filed

03/16/2020: Declaration for Lost Writ Filed

Declaration for Lost Writ Filed

03/16/2020: Declaration for Lost Writ Filed

Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):

03/16/2020: Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):

Memo of Costs Filed. Costs and Interest in the Amount of

07/15/2020: Memo of Costs Filed. Costs and Interest in the Amount of

Writ of Execution Issued - San Bernardino

07/16/2020: Writ of Execution Issued - San Bernardino

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2020
  • FinancialWAHR FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY; Mail Payment; Receipt # FO-2020-0013195; WAHR FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY; $40.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • FinancialWAHR FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY; Transaction Assessment; $40.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - San Bernardino

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemo of Costs Filed. Costs and Interest in the Amount of; Comment: COSTS OF $25.00 INTEREST OF $1170.78

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketDocument Received; Comment: MEMO / WRIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketOrder Filed Re:; Comment: lost writ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocument is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):; Comment: memorandum of cost & writ. Fee for writ is $40. Please correct and submit

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration for Lost Writ Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketDocument Received; Comment: DECL LOST WRIT/MEMO/WRIT RECEIVED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketDocument Received; Comment: LETTER RECEIVED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 04/09/2018
  • FinancialCONV; Counter Payment; Receipt # 20180409-0689; ConversionPayment; $30.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $30.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • DispositionJudgment; Judgment Type: Renewal of Judgment; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To: CASHCALL INC; Awarded Against: FRENCH, MICHELLE; Amount; Damages: $0.00; Pre-Judgment Interest Rate: 0.00 %; Pre-Judgment Interest: $2,322.45; Attorney Fees: $0.00; Costs: $55.00; Other: $2,650.00; Other Comment: Principal; Total: $5027.45

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • FinancialWAHR FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY; Total Financial Assessment: $40.00; Total Payments and Credits: $40.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • FinancialCONV; Total Financial Assessment: $55.00; Total Payments and Credits: $55.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • DocketComment:; Comment: PREVIOUS CASE # IS SMCRS083564

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Renewal of Judgment Issued. Copy Filed; Comment: NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. COPY FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMiscellaneous Document Filed; Comment: MEMO OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT WITH COSTS OF $55.00; CREDIT OF $0.00; INTEREST OF $2,322.45 FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • DocketRenewal of Judgment Filed; Comment: RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED. ORIGINAL JUDGMENT ENTERED 04/29/09 IS ORDERED RENEWED AS FOLLOWS: IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED THAT CASHCALL INC HAVE & RECOVER FROM MICHELLE FRENCH: JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,650.00 INTEREST $2,322.45 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $55.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00. JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $5027.45 STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC) DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC) ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF, JUDGMENT IS FOR PLAINTIFF AND AGAINST DEFENDANT -- NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT MAILED ON 03/12/18. ACTION - COMPLETE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication and Order for Renewal of Judgment Filed; Comment: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT 180409-0689-CK MFF/ 30.00 PAYMT 180409-0689-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 230844

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONV is a litigant

Latest cases where WAHR FINANCIAL GROUP LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where CASHCALL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MIELE KENNETH J. ESQ.