This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/06/2018 at 13:55:58 (UTC).

CASA PARTNERS III LLP-V- WAYNE EVANS

Case Summary

On 04/07/2016 CASA PARTNERS III LLP-V- WAYNE EVANS was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Appeals And Appellate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0010

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Appeals And Appellate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Appellant

WAYNE EVANS

Respondent

CASA PARTNERS III LLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

KIMBALL, TIREY, & ST JOHN LLP

2040 Main Street, Suite 500

Irvine, CA 92614

KIMBALL,TIREY & ST. JOHN LLP

2040 Main Street, Suite 500

Irvine, CA 92614

 

Court Documents

REMITTITUR ISSUED. DECISION: ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL FILED ON 02/22/17.

REMITTITUR ISSUED. DECISION: ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL FILED ON 02/22/17.

ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL PER CRC 8.882(C )(1)- FILED

ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL PER CRC 8.882(C )(1)- FILED

ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL PER CRC 8.882(C )(1)- FILED

ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL PER CRC 8.882(C )(1)- FILED

REQUEST FOR EXTENSION TO FILE APPELLANTS OPENING BRIEF FILED

REQUEST FOR EXTENSION TO FILE APPELLANTS OPENING BRIEF FILED

LATE LETTER SENT RE: FAILURE TO FILE APPELLANTS OPENING BRIEF PLACED IN FILE

LATE LETTER SENT RE: FAILURE TO FILE APPELLANTS OPENING BRIEF PLACED IN FILE

ORDER GRANTING 3RD AND FINAL EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE APPELLANTS OPENING BRIEF FILED

ORDER GRANTING 3RD AND FINAL EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE APPELLANTS OPENING BRIEF FILED

REQUEST FOR EXTENSION TO FILE APPELLANTS OPENING BRIEF FILED

REQUEST FOR EXTENSION TO FILE APPELLANTS OPENING BRIEF FILED

LATE LETTER SENT RE: FAILURE TO FILE APPELLANTS OPENING BRIEF PLACED IN FILE

LATE LETTER SENT RE: FAILURE TO FILE APPELLANTS OPENING BRIEF PLACED IN FILE

ORDER GRANTING 2ND EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE APPELLANTS OPENING BRIEF FILED

ORDER GRANTING 2ND EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE APPELLANTS OPENING BRIEF FILED

REQUEST FOR EXTENSION TO FILE APPELLANTS OPENING BRIEF FILED

REQUEST FOR EXTENSION TO FILE APPELLANTS OPENING BRIEF FILED

LATE LETTER RE: FAILURE TO FILE APPELLANTS OPENING BRIEF PLACED IN FILE

LATE LETTER RE: FAILURE TO FILE APPELLANTS OPENING BRIEF PLACED IN FILE

ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE OPENING BRIEF FILED

ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE OPENING BRIEF FILED

REQUEST FOR EXTENSION TO FILE APPELLANTS OPENING BRIEF FILED

REQUEST FOR EXTENSION TO FILE APPELLANTS OPENING BRIEF FILED

LATE LETTER RE: APPELLANTS OPENING BRIEF PLACED IN FILE

LATE LETTER RE: APPELLANTS OPENING BRIEF PLACED IN FILE

NOTICE OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE FILED.

NOTICE OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE FILED.

RECORD ON APPEAL FILED - 1 VOL CT/ 1 VOL RT

RECORD ON APPEAL FILED - 1 VOL CT/ 1 VOL RT

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REMITTITUR ISSUED. DECISION: ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL FILED ON 02/22/17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • NOTICE ON DECISION OF REMITTITUR PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ALL OTHER JUDGMENTS BEFORE TRIAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • APPEAL COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • APPEAL FILED 04/07/2016 OF WAYNE EVANS COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL PER CRC 8.882(C )(1)- FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • ORDER DENYING 4TH REQUEST FOR EXTENSION- APPELLANTS OPENING BRIEF STILL DUE 2/17/17 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR EXTENSION TO FILE APPELLANTS OPENING BRIEF FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF DUE 02/17/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • LATE LETTER SENT: REGARDING APPELLANTS OPENING BRIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 09/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE OPENING BRIEF FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR EXTENSION TO FILE APPELLANTS OPENING BRIEF FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF DUE 09/23/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • LATE LETTER SENT: REGARDING APPELLANTS OPENING BRIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • LATE LETTER RE: APPELLANTS OPENING BRIEF PLACED IN FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2016
  • APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF DUE 09/01/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • RECORD ON APPEAL FILED - 1 VOL CT/ 1 VOL RT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • SUPERIOR COURT CASE #UDFS1600797- FONTANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.