This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 01:11:09 (UTC).

MF CAROLYN KARNES-CORTES -N- VIRGINIA CHANEY

Case Summary

On 12/14/2016 MF CAROLYN KARNES-CORTES -N- VIRGINIA CHANEY was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0665

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CAROLYN KARNES-CORTES

Respondent

VIRGINIA CHANEY

Others

VIRGINIA LYNN CHANEY

CAROLYN LORRAINE CORTES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Other Attorney

TERRENCE F RILEY

10788 Civic Center Dr Ste 250

Rancho Cucamonga, CA 91730

Respondent Attorney

JOSEPH W HOWINGTON

3281 East Guasti Rd. Ste.175 One Lakeshore Centre

Ontario, CA 91761

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/28/2018
  • HEARING RE: RECEIPT OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • COURT TRIAL SET FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 12/14/2016 OF CAROLYN KARNES-CORTES; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • READINESS CALENDAR; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; M J TORCHIA, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: JESSICA FLORES; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; BAILIFF: L SCOTT; APPEARANCES:; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: CAROLYN KARNES-CORTES, VIRGINIA CHANEY; TERRENCE F RILEY FOR CAROLYN KARNES-CORTES NOT PRESENT; ATTORNEY JOSEPH HOWINGTONS OFFICE FOR RESPONDENT MAKES A TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; ATTORNEY HOWINGTONS OFFICE INDICATES THAT A JUDGMENT IS CIRCULATING. TRIAL DATE VACATED AT; THE REQUEST OF COUNSEL. MATTER SET FOR RECEIPT OF JUDGMENT.; HEARINGS:; TRIAL/COURT DATES VACATED -- CTN HEARING ON 09/12/18 AT 10:00 IN DEPT. S50 IS VACATED.; HEARING RE: RECEIPT OF JUDGMENT SET FOR 11/28/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S50.; COUNSEL FOR RESPONDENT TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • NOTICE OF DESTRUCTION OF EXHIBITS MAILED TO PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • HEARING RE: COURT TRIAL (TENTATIVE); Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • READINESS CALENDAR; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; M J TORCHIA, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: JESSICA FLORES; COURT REPORTER DIANE HICKMAN 13147; BAILIFF: L SCOTT; APPEARANCES:; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: CAROLYN KARNES-CORTES, VIRGINIA CHANEY; ATTORNEY TERRENCE RILEYS OFFICE FOR PETITIONER MAKES A TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE; ATTORNEY CHRISTIAN FOSTER PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF RESPONDENTS COUNSEL.; REASON: RESPONDENTS COUNSEL NOT AVAILABLE ON 6/20/18; PETITIONERS COUNSEL HAS NO OBJECTION TO THE REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE.; HEARINGS:; SET ON TRIAL READINESS/ASSIGNMENT CALENDAR FOR 08/24/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S50; COURT TRIAL ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 12/14/2016 OF CAROLYN KARNES-CORTES IS SET FOR 09/12/18 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT S50; COUNSEL FOR RESPONDENT TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; M J TORCHIA, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: PAULINE RODRIGUEZ; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; BAILIFF: L SCOTT; APPEARANCES:; PETITIONER CAROLYN KARNES-CORTES PRESENT; ATTORNEY TERRENCE RILEY PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: VIRGINIA CHANEY; ATTORNEY JOSEPH HOWINGTON PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE HELD.; COURT AND COUNSEL CONFER IN CHAMBERS OFF THE RECORD; HEARINGS:; SET ON TRIAL READINESS/ASSIGNMENT CALENDAR FOR 06/01/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S50; HEARING RE: COURT TRIAL (TENTATIVE) SET FOR 06/20/18 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT S50.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • RESPONDENTS NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK SANCTIONS UNDER FAMILY CODE SECTION 271 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; M J TORCHIA, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: JESSICA FLORES; COURT REPORTER TONYA FRYE 12524; BAILIFF: L SCOTT; APPEARANCES:; PETITIONER CAROLYN KARNES-CORTES PRESENT; ATTORNEY TERRENCE RILEY PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; RESPONDENT VIRGINIA CHANEY PRESENT; ATTORNEY JOSEPH W. HOWINGTON PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE HELD.; CAROLYN KARNES-CORTES IS PLACED ON SUMMARY PROBATION FOR A PERIOD OF 2 YEAR(S) ON TERMS AND CONDITIONS SET FORTH BELOW.; TERM 1: PERFORM 8 HOURS OF COMMUNITY SERVICE. THIS CONDITION IS STAYED.; TERM 2: VIOLATE NO LAW.; TERM 3: OBEY ALL PROVISIONS OF THE ORDER UNDER THE DVPA ISSUED DECEMBER 21, 2016.; COURT WILL CONSIDER ATTORNEYS FEES DECLARATIONS FROM BOTH COUNSEL.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 02/28/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S50.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • EXHIBITS RECEIVED FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 12/14/2016
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.; Minutes; Receipt: 161215-0389 $435.00; 161215-0389-CK Reference Number 1353

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF REQ FOR DVRO/NOTICE OF HRG/TRO/ETC FILED AS TO CAROLYN LORRAINE CORTES. PARTY SERVED ON 12/08/16. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • MINUTE ORDER DATED 12/05/16 RE: TRO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • NOTICE OF HEARING (DOMESTIC VIOLENCE PREVENTION)FILED BY VIRGINIA LYNN CHANEY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER (DOMESTIC VIOLENCE PREVENTION) FILED BY VIRGINIA LYNN CHANEY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR ORDER ON DOMESTIC VIOLENCE FILED BY VIRGINIA CHANEY.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.