This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/13/2018 at 03:55:42 (UTC).

Carolyn Ann McCormick

Case Summary

On 12/28/2016 Carolyn Ann McCormick was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1284

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DEMA MOTA

Decedent

CAROLYN ANN MCCORMICK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ANDEL, PATRICIA L.

2173 Salk Ave Ste 250

Carlsbad, CA 92008

 

Court Documents

PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY FILED.

PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

ORDER DETERMINING SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY FILED.

ORDER DETERMINING SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

HRG OF 05/09/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 05/09/17 - PROBATE NOTES

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: APPOINTMENT OF JUDGE PRO TEMPORE FILED.

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: APPOINTMENT OF JUDGE PRO TEMPORE FILED.

SUPPLEMENTAL (FIRST) TO PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY FILED. (IMAGED)

SUPPLEMENTAL (FIRST) TO PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY FILED. (IMAGED)

HRG OF 05/09/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 05/09/17 - PROBATE NOTES

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 03/14/17 FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 03/14/17 FILED.

HRG OF 03/14/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 03/14/17 - PROBATE NOTES

RECEIPT FOR WILL LODGED WITH COURT PLACED IN FILE (IMAGED)

RECEIPT FOR WILL LODGED WITH COURT PLACED IN FILE (IMAGED)

HRG OF 03/14/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 03/14/17 - PROBATE NOTES

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY DEMA MOTA FOR CERT COPY OF ORD DTRMNG SUCCESSION TO RP; Minutes; Receipt: 170608-0026 $26.50; 170608-0026-CK Reference Number 1392

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY DEMA MOTA FOR CERTIFIED COPIES; Minutes; Receipt: 170606-0294 $26.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON ORDER DETERMINING SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER DETERMINING SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; CYNTHIA A LUDVIGSEN, JUDGE; CLERK: RACHELE ANDREWS; COURT REPORTER CATHY ALBRITTON 7137; COURT ATTENDANT D NEWCOMB; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY PATRICIA ANDEL APPEARS BY COURT CALL.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY FILED 12/28/2016 OF DEMA MOTA IS GRANTED; ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE.; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION - PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY FILED 12/28/2016 OF DEMA MOTA ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); DISPOSITION ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 05/09/17 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 05/09/17 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUPPLEMENTAL (FIRST) TO PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: APPOINTMENT OF JUDGE PRO TEMPORE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; JUDGE PRO TEM MITCHELL ROTH; CLERK: RACHELE ANDREWS; COURT REPORTER CATHY ALBRITTON 7137; COURT ATTENDANT D NEWCOMB; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY PATRICIA ANDEL APPEARS BY COURT CALL.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); PARTIES ADVISED RE:COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM; NO OBJECTION RAISED. FAILURE TO OBJECT IS DEEMED A STIPULATION TO COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM SITTING AS JUDGE PRO TEM.; MATTER IS CONTINUED TO CLEAR PROBATE NOTES.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 05/09/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S36P.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 03/14/17 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 03/14/17 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON 03/14/17 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT FOR WILL LODGED WITH COURT PLACED IN FILE (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • ORIGINAL WILL LODGED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S36P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON DETERMINING SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE); Minutes; Receipt: 161229-0447 $465.00; 161229-0447-CK Reference Number 104/1521

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.