This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/13/2018 at 03:55:33 (UTC).

CAROL JEANNE HARRISON

Case Summary

On 12/29/2016 CAROL JEANNE HARRISON was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1283

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

JEFF NORMAN

ADAM TAGLE

Decedents

CAROL JEANNE HARRISON

CAROL JEANNE HARISON

Other

STATE OF CALIFORNIA FRANCHISE TAX BOARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

WILSON & WILSON

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING ON REPORT OF SALE AND PETITION FOR ORDER CONFIRMING FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON REPORT OF SALE AND PETITION FOR ORDER CONFIRMING FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON REPORT OF SALE AND PETITION FOR ORDER CONFIRMING FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON REPORT OF SALE AND PETITION FOR ORDER CONFIRMING FILED.

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY ADAM TAGLE, JEFF NORMAN

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY ADAM TAGLE, JEFF NORMAN

INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL: REAPPRAISAL FOR SALE ILED.

INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL: REAPPRAISAL FOR SALE ILED.

NOTICE TO FRANCHISE TAX BOARD FILED BY ADAM TAGLE, JEFF NORMAN.

NOTICE TO FRANCHISE TAX BOARD FILED BY ADAM TAGLE, JEFF NORMAN.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY STATE OF CALIFORNIA FRANCHISE TAX BOARD. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $469.06.

CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY STATE OF CALIFORNIA FRANCHISE TAX BOARD. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $469.06.

HRG OF 01/30/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/30/18 - PROBATE NOTES

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

HRG OF 07/23/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 07/23/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 05/14/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 05/14/18 - PROBATE NOTES

INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL: PARTIAL NO. ILED.

INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL: PARTIAL NO. ILED.

MAILING COVER SHEET OF 03/06/17 MINUTE ORDER (IMAGED)

MAILING COVER SHEET OF 03/06/17 MINUTE ORDER (IMAGED)

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY ADAM TAGLE, JEFF NORMAN

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY ADAM TAGLE, JEFF NORMAN

HRG OF 05/14/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 05/14/18 - PROBATE NOTES

ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR, ADAM TAGLE APPOINTED WITH N/A IAEA. BOND IS NOT REQ., N/A APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR, ADAM TAGLE APPOINTED WITH N/A IAEA. BOND IS NOT REQ., N/A APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

LETTERS ISSUED ( SPECIAL ADMINISTRATION)

LETTERS ISSUED ( SPECIAL ADMINISTRATION)

PETITION RE: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION W/LIMITED IAEA FILED.

PETITION RE: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION W/LIMITED IAEA FILED.

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2019
  • ACCOUNTING REVIEW BY; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • WAIVER OF FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF ADAM TAGLE, JEFF NORMAN AND PETITION FOR ALLOWANCE OF FEES FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ADAM TAGLE, JEFF NORMAN FOR WAIVER OF FIRST AND FINAL; Minutes; Receipt: 180808-0618 $465.00; 180808-0618-CK Reference Number 3629172

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • VACATE PRARV HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 02/25/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S35P.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • WAIVER OF FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNTING REPORT FILED BY ADAM TAGLE, JEFF NORMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • ACCOUNTING REVIEW BY; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; STANFORD E. REICHERT, JUDGE; CLERK: TIFFANY KRETZMEIER; COURT REPORTER VIVIAN TRISTAN 14244; COURT ATTENDANT M DE LA ROSA; APPEARANCES:; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY THOMAS BARCKLAY FOR DANIEL WILSON (VIA COURTCALL) FOR ADAM TAGLE & JEFF NORMAN.; PROCEEDINGS:; REVIEW HEARING HELD; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF COUNSEL.; REASON: TO FILE ACCOUNTING; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 02/25/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S35P.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 07/23/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 07/23/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • ACCOUNTING REVIEW BY; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; MITCHELL ROTH, JUDGE PRO TEM; CLERK: SHANNON PRATT; COURT REPORTER LIZA CACHOLA 13935; COURT ATTENDANT D MORENO; APPEARANCES:; DANIEL WILSON APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR ADAM TAGLE, JEFF NORMAN.; PROCEEDINGS:; REVIEW HEARING HELD; PARTIES ADVISED RE:COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM; NO OBJECTION RAISED. FAILURE TO OBJECT IS DEEMED A STIPULATION TO COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM SITTING AS JUDGE PRO TEM.; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF COUNSEL.; REASON: TO FINALIZE ACCOUNTING.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 07/23/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S35P.; NOTICE TO BE GIVEN BY MR. WILSON.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 05/14/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 01/05/2017
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 170105-0638 $3.00; 170105-0638-MC Reference Number 031-0004584171

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • CONFIDENTIAL STATEMENT OF BIRTH DATE AND DRIVER'S LICENSE NUMBER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • CONFIDENTIAL STATEMENT OF BIRTH DATE AND DRIVER'S LICENSE NUMBER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • PROPOSED LETTERS RECEIVED (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY ADAM TAGLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION RE: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION W/LIMITED IAEA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON APPOINTING ADMINISTRATOR RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S35P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE); Minutes; Receipt: 161229-0339 $465.00; 161229-0339-CK Reference Number 144607

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.