This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/15/2018 at 01:10:27 (UTC).

CARLOS R. CARIAS -N- MARIA DE LOS ANGELES LOPEZ

Case Summary

On 09/27/2017 CARLOS R CARIAS -N- MARIA DE LOS ANGELES LOPEZ was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8360

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CARLOS R CARIAS

Respondent

MARIA DE LOS ANGEL LOPEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

KLINEFELTER, MARITZA FLORES

1025 West Arrow Hwy Suite 205

Glendora, CA 91740

MARITZA F KLINEFELTER, ESQ

1025 W Arrow Hwy Suite 205

Glendora, CA 91740

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2022
  • HEARING OSC DISMISSAL OF ACTION/FAILURE TO TRIAL (5 YEARS).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON MARIA DE LOS ANGEL LOPEZ FOR FAX FILING/COPIES IN THE AMOUNT OF $7.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • SUB OF ATTY FILED 06/27/18 MAILED TO MARITZA KLINEFELTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • PARTY MARIA DE LOS ANGEL LOPEZ UPDATED: ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING MARITZA F KLINEFELTER, ESQ WITH PRO/PER AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR MARIA DE LOS ANGEL LOPEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • CASE RESOLUTION STATUS CONFERENCE; Disposition: Off Calendar; Minutes; MICHAEL J GASSNER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: AMBER BOUCHARD; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; BAILIFF: F WILKERSON; APPEARANCES:; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: CARLOS R CARIAS, MARIA DE LOS ANGEL LOPEZ; ATTORNEY MARITZA F. KLINEFELTER PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; ACTION CAME ON FOR STATUS CONFERENCE (FL); OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: AT REQUEST OF COUNSEL FOR RESPONDENT.; COUNSEL FOR RESPONDENT INDICATES THAT PARTIES ARE CURRENTLY STILL RESIDING TOGETHER.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL FILED BY MARIA DE LOS ANGEL LOPEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • NOTICE OF CASE RESOLUTION STATUS CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • INFORMATIONAL CHECK LIST PROVIDED TO CARLOS R CARIAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 10/27/2017
  • RESPONSE TO DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN FILED 09/27/2017 OF CARLOS CARIAS BY MARIA DE LOS ANGEL LOPEZ FILED. REPRESENTED BY MARITZA FLORES KLINEFELTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON MARIA DE LOS ANGEL LOPEZ; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 09/28/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • DECLARATION UNDER UCCJEA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • COMMUNITY AND QUASI COMMUNITY PROPERTY DECLARATION OF CARLOS R CARIAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • SEPARATE PROPERTY DECLARATION FILED BY CARLOS R. CARIAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • FINANCIAL STATEMENTS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170927-0708 $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less