This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/11/2018 at 21:40:14 (UTC).

CARL LEE MCDONALD

Case Summary

On 10/03/2017 CARL LEE MCDONALD was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0988

  • Filing Date:

    10/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KRISTINE PARADA

Decedent

CARL LEE MCDONALD

Not Classified By Court

LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

MERCER, JAMES

5005 La Mart Drive, Suite 101

Riverside, CA 92507

LAW OFFICE OF MARKABELL

1461 Ford Street Ste. 203

Redlands, CA 92373

 

Court Documents

ASSIGNMENT OF INTEREST BY SCOTT D. MCDONALD FILED.

ASSIGNMENT OF INTEREST BY SCOTT D. MCDONALD FILED.

ASSIGNMENT OF INTEREST BY KRISTINE PARADA FILED.

ASSIGNMENT OF INTEREST BY KRISTINE PARADA FILED.

HRG OF 02/01/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 02/01/18 - PROBATE NOTES

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NTC. OF PET. TO ADMINISTER 1/8, 1/9, 1/15/18 FILED.

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NTC. OF PET. TO ADMINISTER 1/8, 1/9, 1/15/18 FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION FOR LETTERS OF SPECIAL ADMINISTRATION FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION FOR LETTERS OF SPECIAL ADMINISTRATION FILED.

ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR, KRISTINE PARADA APPOINTED WITH -- IAEA. BOND NOT REQ, PATRICK B WRIGHT APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR, KRISTINE PARADA APPOINTED WITH -- IAEA. BOND NOT REQ, PATRICK B WRIGHT APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

LETTERS OF TEMPORARY SPECIAL ADMINISTRATION ISSUED

LETTERS OF TEMPORARY SPECIAL ADMINISTRATION ISSUED

PETITION FOR LETTERS OF SPECIAL ADMINISTRATION FILED BY KRISTINE PARADA(PROBATE).

PETITION FOR LETTERS OF SPECIAL ADMINISTRATION FILED BY KRISTINE PARADA(PROBATE).

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY KRISTINE PARADA

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY KRISTINE PARADA

RECEIPT FOR WILL LODGED WITH COURT PLACED IN FILE

RECEIPT FOR WILL LODGED WITH COURT PLACED IN FILE

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY KRISTINE PARADA

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY KRISTINE PARADA

PETITION RE: PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY W/FULL IAEA FILED.

PETITION RE: PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY W/FULL IAEA FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2019
  • ACCOUNTING REVIEW BY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY JAMES MERCER(PREVIOUS ATTY FOR ESTATE). TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $591.72.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • HEARING RE: RECEIPT OF BOND; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • HRG OF 07/05/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • VACATE HRG HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 07/05/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37P.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • LETTERS ISSUED ( TESTAMENTARY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • CASE ADDED TO COURT SUPERVISION (PROBATE).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY KRISTINE PARADA FOR 2CC LETTERS; Minutes; Receipt: 180621-0121 $51.00; 180621-0121-CK Reference Number 17633

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • ON THE PETITION FOR WILL AND LETTERS TESTAMENTARY FILED 10/03/2017 OF KRISTINE PARADA, LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY IS ADDED AS A BOND COMPANY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • SURETY BOND ISSUED KRISTINE PARADA IN THE AMT OF 75,000.00 BY LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 10/26/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON APPOINTING EXECUTOR RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY KRISTINE PARADA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT FOR WILL LODGED WITH COURT PLACED IN FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • ORIGINAL WILL LODGED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY KRISTINE PARADA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • CONFIDENTIAL STATEMENT OF BIRTH DATE AND DRIVER'S LICENSE NUMBER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • PROPOSED LETTERS RECEIVED (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S37P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION RE: PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY W/FULL IAEA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE); Minutes; Receipt: 171003-0644 $465.00

    Read MoreRead Less