This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 14:50:57 (UTC).

CARIAS VS HAIROUN MANAGEMENT

Case Summary

On 12/22/2016 CARIAS filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against HAIROUN MANAGEMENT. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1932

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAQUEL CARIAS

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

ANTHONY LIONEL LESLIE

IMPACT CARE ACCESSNETWORK, INC

HAIROUN MANAGEMENT, INC

EMMANUEL JEANPIERRE

EMANUEL JEAN PIERRE

ANTHONY LANE

IMPACT CARE ACCESSNETWORK II

IMPACT CARE MEDICAL GROUP, INC.

PHILIP KOUROS

CHRISTINE MICHELLE GROVES

HAIROUN MANAGEMENT, INC.

IMPACT CARE ACCESSNETWORK, INC.

Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

CHRISTINE MICHELLE GROVES

HAIROUN MANAGEMENT, INC.

IMPACT CARE ACCESSNETWORK, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HEANNEMANN KAW FIRM, A PROFFESIONAL CORPORA

1042 N Mountain Ave Suite B-222

Upland, CA 91786

MCNALLY LAW FIRM

5811 Pine Ave Suite A

Chino Hills, CA 91709

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF MICHAEL I SCHILLER

3838 Carson St Suite 106

Torrance, CA 90503

EZER WILLIAMSON LAW

21515 Hawthorne Blvd Ste 1150

Torrance, CA 90503

DOHERTY, KATEY

1042 N Mountain Ave B-596

Upland, CA 91786

 

Court Documents

EXHIBIT INDEX IN SPPT OF OPPO TO MTN FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION FILED. (IMAGED)

EXHIBIT INDEX IN SPPT OF OPPO TO MTN FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION FILED. (IMAGED)

EXHIBIT INDEX IN SPPT OF OPPO TO MTN FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION FILED. (IMAGED)

EXHIBIT INDEX IN SPPT OF OPPO TO MTN FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION FILED. (IMAGED)

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO EMANUEL JEAN PIERRE, WITH PREJUDICE

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO EMANUEL JEAN PIERRE, WITH PREJUDICE

COURT RULING ON DEMURRER OF IMPACT AND KOUROS HELD 5/16/19 FILED.

COURT RULING ON DEMURRER OF IMPACT AND KOUROS HELD 5/16/19 FILED.

NOTICE OF RULING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION FILED.

NOTICE OF RULING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION FILED.

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED.

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED.

DECLARATION RE: PETERS IN SPPT OF OPPO TO MTN FILED BY HAIROUN MANAGEMENT,INC, IMPACT CARE ACCESSNETWORK, INC, EMANUEL JEAN PIERRE, ANTHONY LANE (IMAGED)

DECLARATION RE: PETERS IN SPPT OF OPPO TO MTN FILED BY HAIROUN MANAGEMENT,INC, IMPACT CARE ACCESSNETWORK, INC, EMANUEL JEAN PIERRE, ANTHONY LANE (IMAGED)

CC SEP STMT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS IN OPPOSITON CD MTN ALTERNATIVE FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION FILED. (IMAGED)

CC SEP STMT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS IN OPPOSITON CD MTN ALTERNATIVE FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION FILED. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO IMPACT CARE ACCESSNETWORK II SERVED ON 02/19/19 WITH FEES OF $140.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO IMPACT CARE ACCESSNETWORK II SERVED ON 02/19/19 WITH FEES OF $140.00.

PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE UNDER CCP 170.6 AS TO THOMAS S. GARZA.

PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE UNDER CCP 170.6 AS TO THOMAS S. GARZA.

NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL ON THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF RAQUEL CARIAS AS TO HAIROUN MANAGEMENT,INC, IMPACT CARE ACCESSNETWORK, INC, EMANUEL JEAN PIERRE, ANTHONY LANE ADDING ATTORNEY EZER WILLIAMSON LAW FILED

NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL ON THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF RAQUEL CARIAS AS TO HAIROUN MANAGEMENT,INC, IMPACT CARE ACCESSNETWORK, INC, EMANUEL JEAN PIERRE, ANTHONY LANE ADDING ATTORNEY EZER WILLIAMSON LAW FILED

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT NAMING DOES 3 TO BE IMPACT CARE ACCESS NETWORK II FILED.

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT NAMING DOES 3 TO BE IMPACT CARE ACCESS NETWORK II FILED.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: TO FILE FAC & CONTINUE TRIAL/VCMS DATES FILED.

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: TO FILE FAC & CONTINUE TRIAL/VCMS DATES FILED.; Minutes; THE COURT REFERS THIS MATTER TO A VOLUNTARY CIVIL MEDIATION SESSION. A ONE-HOUR BLOCK OF TIME HAS BEEN RESERVED FOR THIS PURPOSE AS FOLLOWS: 12/07/18 AT 01:30 IN DEPARTMENT S34.; SET ON TRIAL READINESS/ASSIGNMENT CALENDAR FOR 05/02/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S27; JURY TRIAL SET FOR 05/06/19 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT S27 ESTIMATED DURATION OF 7 DAYS.

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO ANTHONY LIONEL LESLIE, WITH PREJUDICE

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO ANTHONY LIONEL LESLIE, WITH PREJUDICE

DECLARATION OF BRYAN L MCNALLY RE OSC RE POS FILED

DECLARATION OF BRYAN L MCNALLY RE OSC RE POS FILED

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY HAIROUN MANAGEMENT,INC.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY HAIROUN MANAGEMENT,INC.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

54 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2020
  • JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • READINESS CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO EMANUEL JEAN PIERRE, WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY HAIROUN MANAGEMENT,INC, IMPACT CARE ACCESSNETWORK, INC, ANTHONY LANE, IMPACT CARE ACCESSNETWORK II, PHILIP KOUROS; PARTY REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICES OF MICHAEL I SCHILLER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • FILING FEE PAID BY HAIROUN MANAGEMENT,INC, IMPACT CARE ACCESSNETWORK, INC, EMANUEL JEAN PIERRE, ANTHONY LANE, IMPACT CARE ACCESSNETWORK, INC., ANTHONY LANE, IMPACT CARE ACCESSNETWORK II, PHILIP KOUROS FOR FAX FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 190702-0985 $8.00; 190702-0985-VS Reference Number 033-0137112400

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED AS TO HAIROUN MANAGEMENT,INC, IMPACT CARE ACCESSNETWORK, INC, EMANUEL JEAN PIERRE, ANTHONY LANE, IMPACT CARE ACCESSNETWORK II, PHILIP KOUROS. PARTY SERVED ON 05/28/19. TYPE OF SERVICE IS MAIL. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF RAQUEL CARIAS; Minutes; SET ASIDE DISPOSITION OF DEFENDANT IMPACT CARE MEDICALGROUP, INC..; SET ASIDE REQUEST FOR DEFAULT AS TO IMPACT CARE MEDICALGROUP, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • FILING FEE PAID BY RAQUEL CARIAS FOR FAX FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 190604-0706 $25.00; 190604-0706-VS Reference Number 033-0132026899

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RULING ON ON DEMURRER OF DEFENDANT 05/16/19 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
112 More Docket Entries
  • 12/22/2016
  • PARTY EMANUEL JEAN PIERRE UPDATED: NAME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY RAQUEL CARIAS FOR NEW FILING; Minutes; Receipt: 161222-0716 $435.00; 161222-0716-CK Reference Number 3500718

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • PLAINTIFF RAQUEL CARIAS FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 12/22/2016 OF RAQUEL CARIAS FOR RAQUEL CARIAS, ATTORNEY MCNALLY LAW FIRM ADDED.

    Read MoreRead Less