This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/11/2018 at 13:08:38 (UTC).

CARDENAS-V-LG ELECTRONICS ALABAMA INC, ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/26/2015 CARDENAS-V-LG ELECTRONICS ALABAMA INC was filed as a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7449

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EUGENIA CARDENAS

Defendants

LG ELECTRONICS ALABAMA INC, ANALABAMA

STERLING USA, INC,A CALIFORNINA CORPORATIO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MCNICHOLAS

10866 Wilshire Blvd Ste 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90024

MCNICHOLAS &MCNICHOLAS

10866 Wilshire Blvd Ste 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Defendant Attorneys

WILSON ELSER MOSKOWITZ EDELMAN& DICKER

401 West A Street Suite 1900

San Diego, CA 92101

LAW OFFICE OF TIMOTHY P CREYAUFMILLER

1905 E Route 66 Suite 102

Glendora, CA 91740

 

Court Documents

ORDER ON PLAS MTN FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT CCP SECTION 877 AND 877.6 FILED

ORDER ON PLAS MTN FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT CCP SECTION 877 AND 877.6 FILED

ORDER ON PLAS MTN FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT CCP SECTION 877 AND 877.6 FILED

ORDER ON PLAS MTN FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT CCP SECTION 877 AND 877.6 FILED

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

NOTICE OF RULING RE DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLE FILED BY EUGENIA CARDENAS.

NOTICE OF RULING RE DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLE FILED BY EUGENIA CARDENAS.

MOTION RE: FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT SET FOR HEARING ON 07/20/16, FILED BY PLAINTIFF EUGENIA CARDENAS (IMAGED)

MOTION RE: FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT SET FOR HEARING ON 07/20/16, FILED BY PLAINTIFF EUGENIA CARDENAS (IMAGED)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: CONTINUING TRIAL DATE FILED.

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: CONTINUING TRIAL DATE FILED.; Minutes; JURY TRIAL SET FOR 10/11/16 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT S29 ESTIMATED DURATION OF 6 DAYS.; SET ON TRIAL READINESS/ASSIGNMENT CALENDAR FOR 10/06/16 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S29

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

ORDER TRIAL SETTING FILED

ORDER TRIAL SETTING FILED

ANSWER FILED BY STERLING USA, INC,A CALIFORNINA CORPORATIO; PARTY REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICE OF TIMOTHY P CREYAUFMILLER.

ANSWER FILED BY STERLING USA, INC,A CALIFORNINA CORPORATIO; PARTY REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICE OF TIMOTHY P CREYAUFMILLER.

ANSWER FILED BY LG ELECTRONICS ALABAMA INC, ANALABAMA; PARTY REPRESENTED BY WILSON ELSER MOSKOWITZ EDELMAN& DICKER.

ANSWER FILED BY LG ELECTRONICS ALABAMA INC, ANALABAMA; PARTY REPRESENTED BY WILSON ELSER MOSKOWITZ EDELMAN& DICKER.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO STERLING USA, INC,A CALIFORNINA CORPORATIO SERVED ON 06/16/15 WITH FEES OF $67.95.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO STERLING USA, INC,A CALIFORNINA CORPORATIO SERVED ON 06/16/15 WITH FEES OF $67.95.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO LG ELECTRONICS ALABAMA INC, ANALABAMA SERVED ON 06/08/15 WITH FEES OF $145.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO LG ELECTRONICS ALABAMA INC, ANALABAMA SERVED ON 06/08/15 WITH FEES OF $145.00.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2016
  • JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • READINESS CALENDAR; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO LG ELECTRONICS ALABAMA INC, ANALABAMA, WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON PLAS MTN FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT CCP SECTION 877 AND 877.6 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2016
  • MOTION RE: FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT (061516) FILED BY PLAINTIFF EUGENIA CARDENAS; Disposition: GRANTED; Minutes; JANET M FRANGIE, JUDGE; CLERK: THERESA HANDYSIDE; NOT REPORTED; COURT ATTENDANT D ZWIERLEIN; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MOTION; EUGENIA CARDENAS'S MOTION GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT IS HEARD.; NO OPPOSITION PRESENTED.; SUBMITTED ON POINTS AND AUTHORITIES WITHOUT APPEARANCE.; COURT FINDS:; EUGENIA CARDENAS'S MOTION GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT IS GRANTED.; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.; ; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RULING RE DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLE FILED BY EUGENIA CARDENAS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2016
  • NOTICE OF RULING RE: GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): HEARING IS SCHEDULED FOR 07/20/16. CAN NOT FILE UNTIL AFT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY EUGENIA CARDENAS FOR MTN FOR GOOD FAITH; Minutes; Receipt: 160615-0378 $90.00; 160615-0378-CK Reference Number 0579

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 07/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO LG ELECTRONICS ALABAMA INC, ANALABAMA SERVED ON 06/08/15 WITH FEES OF $145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2015
  • ADVANCED JURY FEES POSTED FOR EUGENIA CARDENAS.; Minutes; Receipt: 150526-1607 $150.00; 150526-1607-CK Reference Number CK33964

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2015
  • PRAYER FOR INTEREST PERCENTAGE RATE OF 0. PER ANNUM BEGINNING DATE OF 05/26/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2015
  • FILING FEE PAID BY EUGENIA CARDENAS FOR FILING FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 150526-1605 $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2015
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2015
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S29

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.