This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/16/2018 at 07:26:21 (UTC).

CARBON CANYON V MOAK

Case Summary

On 05/04/2011 CARBON CANYON filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MOAK. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Chino District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0238

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chino District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CARBON CANYON, LTD.

Defendants

RENEE ROEDERER

JASON MOAK

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DIANE M ANDRIKOS

1801 East Edinger Ave Ste 230

Santa Ana, CA 92705

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2011
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2011
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( SHERIFF OFFICE VIA MAIL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2011
  • SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2011
  • APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION -- WRIT FEE TAKEN.; Minutes; Receipt: 110526-1168 $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2011
  • CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 05/04/2011 OF CARBON CANYON, LTD. ORDERED ENTERED 05/25/11; JUDGMENT FOR: CARBON CANYON, LTD.; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JASON MOAK, RENEE ROEDERER, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: CARBON CANYON, LTD.. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2011
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST JASON MOAK, RENEE ROEDERER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2011
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 05/04/2011 OF CARBON CANYON, LTD. AS TO JASON MOAK, RENEE ROEDERER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 05/06/11 WITH FEES OF $95.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2011
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO RENEE ROEDERER SERVED ON 05/06/11 WITH COSTS OF $95.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2011
  • ON THE UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 05/04/2011 OF CARBON CANYON, LTD., ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON JASON MOAK; PARTY SERVED ON 05/06/11 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $95.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 110506-0100 $255.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT C1

    Read MoreRead Less