This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/07/2018 at 11:20:54 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE -V- WADE

Case Summary

On 02/01/2016 CAPITAL ONE filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against WADE. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1456

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

Defendant

DEANNA K WADE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BLEIER & COX, APC

16130 Ventura Boulevard Suite 620

Encino, CA 91436-2568

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2017
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. FOR ABSTRACT FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 160524-0723 $25.00; 160524-0723-CK Reference Number 040526

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2016
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2016
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 02/01/2016 OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 02/01/2016 OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. ORDERED ENTERED 04/22/16; JUDGMENT FOR: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.; JUDGMENT AGAINST: DEANNA K WADE; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $3,390.55 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $310.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $3,700.55; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2016
  • DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 02/01/2016 OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. AS TO DOES ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2016
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST DEANNA K WADE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2016
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 02/01/2016 OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. AS TO DEANNA K WADE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2016
  • DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585(B), (C) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/22/2016
  • DECLARATION RE: NONMILITARY STATUS FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 08/04/16 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S35.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO DEANNA K WADE SERVED ON 03/02/16 WITH FEES OF $70.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $3,390.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • COMPLAINT FILED; Minutes; Receipt: 160204-1397 $240.00; 160204-1397-CK Reference Number CK 012458

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S35

    Read MoreRead Less