This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/10/2018 at 04:52:27 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE -V- TREJO

Case Summary

On 12/14/2016 CAPITAL ONE filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against TREJO. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1282

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

Defendant

ELIZABETH TREJO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BLEIER & COX

16130 Ventura Blvd. Suite 620

Encino, CA 91436

 

Court Documents

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFFS ATTORNEY RE DEBT NOT SOLD OR RESOLD FILED

DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFFS ATTORNEY RE DEBT NOT SOLD OR RESOLD FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON ELIZABETH TREJO.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON ELIZABETH TREJO.

DECLARATION RE: IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT CCP 585 FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

DECLARATION RE: IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT CCP 585 FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $59.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00)

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $59.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00)

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED; JUDGMENT IS FULLY SATISFIED IN THE AMOUNT OF $3,178.41

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED; JUDGMENT IS FULLY SATISFIED IN THE AMOUNT OF $3,178.41

DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 12/14/2016 OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. AS TO DOES ONLY

DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 12/14/2016 OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. AS TO DOES ONLY

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 12/14/2016 OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. FILED

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 12/14/2016 OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 12/14/2016 OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. ORDERED ENTERED 02/27/17; JUDGMENT FOR: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.; JUDGMENT AGAINST: ELIZABETH TREJO; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,868.41 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $310.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $3,178.41; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFFS ATTORNEY RE NONMILITARY STATUS FILED

DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFFS ATTORNEY RE NONMILITARY STATUS FILED

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO ELIZABETH TREJO SERVED ON 12/27/16 WITH FEES OF $70.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO ELIZABETH TREJO SERVED ON 12/27/16 WITH FEES OF $70.00.

NOTICE OF CORRECTED HEARING DATES SENT.

NOTICE OF CORRECTED HEARING DATES SENT.; Minutes; DUE TO CLERICAL ERROR PLEASE DISREGARD THE PREVIOUS NOTICE OF HEARINGS. THE HEARINGS HAVE; BEEN CORRECTED AND A NEW NOTICE HAS BEEN SENT OUT TO YOU..

DECLARATION RE: IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT CCP 585 FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

DECLARATION RE: IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT CCP 585 FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2017
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • JUDGMENT STATUS IS NOW SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED; JUDGMENT IS FULLY SATISFIED IN THE AMOUNT OF $3,178.41

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY ( $3,262.41 ); Minutes; Receipt: 170711-0855 $25.00; 170711-0855-CK Reference Number 700488

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $59.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. FOR ABSTRACT; Minutes; Receipt: 170403-0996 $25.00; 170403-0996-CK Reference Number 063914

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFFS ATTORNEY RE DEBT NOT SOLD OR RESOLD FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 12/14/2016 OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 12/14/2016 OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. ORDERED ENTERED 02/27/17; JUDGMENT FOR: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.; JUDGMENT AGAINST: ELIZABETH TREJO; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,868.41 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $310.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $3,178.41; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 02/10/2017
  • VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 06/26/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO ELIZABETH TREJO SERVED ON 12/27/16 WITH FEES OF $70.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CORRECTED HEARING DATES SENT.; Minutes; DUE TO CLERICAL ERROR PLEASE DISREGARD THE PREVIOUS NOTICE OF HEARINGS. THE HEARINGS HAVE; BEEN CORRECTED AND A NEW NOTICE HAS BEEN SENT OUT TO YOU..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 161216-0038 $240.00; 161216-0038-CK Reference Number 015194

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.