This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 03:59:02 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE -V- TRAN

Case Summary

On 09/14/2017 CAPITAL ONE -V- TRAN was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7997

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

Defendant

DANNY D TRAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BLEIER & COX

16130 Ventura Blvd. Suite 620

Encino, CA 91436

PATENAUDE & FELIX,A.P.C

16130 Ventura Blvd Suite 620

Encino, CA 91436-2542

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFFS ATTORNEY RE NONMILITARY STATUS FILED

DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFFS ATTORNEY RE NONMILITARY STATUS FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO DANNY D TRAN SERVED ON 10/13/17 WITH FEES OF $70.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO DANNY D TRAN SERVED ON 10/13/17 WITH FEES OF $70.00.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OF BLEIER & COX FOR CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. CHANGES ITS NAME TO PATENAUDE & FELIX,A.P.C FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 03/15/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO DANNY D TRAN SERVED ON 10/13/17 WITH FEES OF $70.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFFS ATTORNEY RE NONMILITARY STATUS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • PLAINTIFF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $11,553.56

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. FOR FILING FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170915-0798 $380.00; 170915-0798-CK Reference Number 002342

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less