This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/03/2018 at 16:47:58 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE V SILVA

Case Summary

On 02/06/2017 CAPITAL ONE filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SILVA. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2209

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

Defendant

ROBERTO SILVA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BLEIER & COX

16130 Ventura Blvd. Suite 620

Encino, CA 91436

 

Court Documents

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED; Minutes; Receipt: 170809-0073 $25.00; 170809-0073-CK Reference Number 071769

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 02/06/2017 OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 02/06/2017 OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. ORDERED ENTERED 06/19/17; JUDGMENT FOR: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.; JUDGMENT AGAINST: ROBERTO SILVA; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $6,515.32 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $310.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $6,825.32; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • DECLARATION RE: CCP 1033(B) FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • DECLARATION RE: CCP 585 FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • DECLARATION RE: NON MILITARY STATUS FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 02/06/2017 OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. AS TO DOES ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ROBERTO SILVA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 02/06/2017 OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. AS TO ROBERTO SILVA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO ROBERTO SILVA SERVED ON 04/03/17 WITH FEES OF $70.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 170208-0168 $240.00; 170208-0168-CK Reference Number 015612

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.