This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 03:17:32 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE -V- SALINAS

Case Summary

On 09/14/2017 CAPITAL ONE filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SALINAS. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7824

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

Defendant

CARLOS SALINAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUNT & HENRIQUES, ATTORNEYS ATLAW

151 Bernal Rd. Suite 8

San Jose, CA 95119

 

Court Documents

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST CARLOS SALINAS FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST CARLOS SALINAS FILED.

DECLARATION RE: INTEREST, CCP1033, ATTORNEY FEES FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

DECLARATION RE: INTEREST, CCP1033, ATTORNEY FEES FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. FILED

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. ORDERED ENTERED 12/27/17; JUDGMENT FOR: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.; JUDGMENT AGAINST: CARLOS SALINAS; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $3,175.81 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $299.50 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $3,475.31; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. FILED

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. ORDERED ENTERED 12/27/17; JUDGMENT FOR: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.; JUDGMENT AGAINST: CARLOS SALINAS; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $3,175.81 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $299.50 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $3,475.31; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. FILED

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. ORDERED ENTERED 12/27/17; JUDGMENT FOR: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.; JUDGMENT AGAINST: CARLOS SALINAS; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $3,175.81 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $299.50 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $3,475.31; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT BY MAIL ON 10/10/17 AS TO CARLOS SALINAS, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT BY MAIL ON 10/10/17 AS TO CARLOS SALINAS, FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO CARLOS SALINAS SERVED ON 10/10/17 WITH FEES OF $59.50.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO CARLOS SALINAS SERVED ON 10/10/17 WITH FEES OF $59.50.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED; JUDGMENT IS FULLY SATISFIED IN THE AMOUNT OF $3,475.31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • JUDGMENT STATUS IS NOW SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. FOR ABSTRACT; Minutes; Receipt: 180112-0311 $25.00; 180112-0311-CK Reference Number CK-766188

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST CARLOS SALINAS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. AS TO CARLOS SALINAS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: INTEREST, CCP1033, ATTORNEY FEES FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. ORDERED ENTERED 12/27/17; JUDGMENT FOR: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.; JUDGMENT AGAINST: CARLOS SALINAS; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $3,175.81 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $299.50 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $3,475.31; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/14/2017
  • PLAINTIFF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $3,175.81

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • PRAYER FOR INTEREST PERCENTAGE RATE OF 0.00 PER ANNUM BEGINNING DATE OF 08/05/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170918-0075 $240.00; 170918-0075-CK Reference Number 736527

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less