This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/10/2018 at 05:25:24 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE -V- PULIDO ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/14/2016 CAPITAL ONE filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PULIDO. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1474

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA

Defendants

PRIME CUTS AND ASSOCIATES

CAROLINE A ALVARADO PULIDO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THE MOORE LAW GROUP

3710 S Susan Street Suite 210

Santa Ana, CA 92704

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON CAROLINE A ALVARADO PULIDO; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/07/17 WITH COSTS OF $69.50 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON CAROLINE A ALVARADO PULIDO; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/07/17 WITH COSTS OF $69.50 FILED.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED.

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

DECLARATION OF SUPP OF APP FOR ENTRY OF DEFUALT JUDGMENT CCP 585 FILED

DECLARATION OF SUPP OF APP FOR ENTRY OF DEFUALT JUDGMENT CCP 585 FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON PRIME CUTS AND ASSOCIATES; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 02/04/17 WITH COSTS OF $65.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON PRIME CUTS AND ASSOCIATES; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 02/04/17 WITH COSTS OF $65.00 FILED.

DECLARATION OF SUPP OF ENTRY JUDGMENT RE: COMPLIANCE CCP 1033 FILED

DECLARATION OF SUPP OF ENTRY JUDGMENT RE: COMPLIANCE CCP 1033 FILED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON CAROLINE A ALVARADO PULIDO, PRIME CUTS AND ASSOCIATES.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON CAROLINE A ALVARADO PULIDO, PRIME CUTS AND ASSOCIATES.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 12/14/2016 OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA FILED

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 12/14/2016 OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 12/14/2016 OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA ORDERED ENTERED 04/21/17; JUDGMENT FOR: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA; JUDGMENT AGAINST: CAROLINE A ALVARADO PULIDO, PRIME CUTS AND ASSOCIATES; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,919.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $374.50 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $3,293.50; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2017
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA FOR ABSTRACT; Minutes; Receipt: 170629-0114 $25.00; 170629-0114-CK Reference Number 948853

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF SUPP OF APP FOR ENTRY OF DEFUALT JUDGMENT CCP 585 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 12/14/2016 OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 12/14/2016 OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA ORDERED ENTERED 04/21/17; JUDGMENT FOR: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA; JUDGMENT AGAINST: CAROLINE A ALVARADO PULIDO, PRIME CUTS AND ASSOCIATES; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,919.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $374.50 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $3,293.50; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF SUPP OF ENTRY JUDGMENT RE: COMPLIANCE CCP 1033 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON CAROLINE A ALVARADO PULIDO, PRIME CUTS AND ASSOCIATES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 12/14/2016 OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA AS TO CAROLINE A ALVARADO PULIDO, PRIME CUTS AND ASSOCIATES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 06/28/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON PRIME CUTS AND ASSOCIATES; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 02/04/17 WITH COSTS OF $65.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON CAROLINE A ALVARADO PULIDO; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/07/17 WITH COSTS OF $69.50 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 161221-0638 $240.00; 161221-0638-CK Reference Number 934954

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.