This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/07/2018 at 12:52:30 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE -V- OLIVAS

Case Summary

On 02/01/2016 CAPITAL ONE filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against OLIVAS. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1926

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK

Defendant

MARIE C OLIVAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LEGAL RECOVERY LAWOFFICES, INC

5030 Camino De La Siesta, #340

San Diego, CA 92108

BLEIER & COX

16130 Ventura Blvd Penthouse Suite 620

Encino, CA 91436

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2017
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING LEGAL RECOVERY LAWOFFICES, INC WITH BLEIER & COX AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR CAPITAL ONE BANK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( 3761.07 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CAPITAL ONE BANK FOR WRIT FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 160330-0381 $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. COPY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • ROJ FILED 02/01/16 ORIGINAL CASE NUMBER SCISS147907

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • PLAINTIFF CAPITAL ONE BANK FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • ORIGINAL DOCS FOR SCISS147907

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF APPLICATION FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGEMENT BY MAIL ON 01/21/16 AS TO MARIE C OLIVAS, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CAPITAL ONE BANK FOR RENEWAL; Minutes; Receipt: 160209-0271 $30.00; 160209-0271-CK Reference Number 195101

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • MEMO OF COSTS FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK, FOR 1566.06 INTEREST.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S35

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED.; Minutes; ORIGINAL JUDGMENT ENTERED 08/23/07 IS ORDERED RENEWED AS FOLLOWS:; IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED THAT CAPITAL ONE BANK HAVE &; RECOVER FROM MARIE C OLIVAS:; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,140.01 INTEREST $1,566.06 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $30.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $3,736.07; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OTHER CLERK JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OTHER CLERK JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less