This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/07/2018 at 11:11:09 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE -V- MEAGHER

Case Summary

On 02/01/2016 CAPITAL ONE filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MEAGHER. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1403

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

Defendant

WALTER P MEAGHER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BLEIER & COX, APC

16130 Ventura Boulevard Suite 620

Encino, CA 91436-2542

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2017
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED; JUDGMENT IS FULLY SATISFIED IN THE AMOUNT OF $5,358.95

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • JUDGMENT STATUS IS NOW SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2016
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. FOR ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 160509-0685 $25.00; 160509-0685-CK Reference Number CK 040032

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 02/01/2016 OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 02/01/2016 OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. ORDERED ENTERED 04/08/16; JUDGMENT FOR: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.; JUDGMENT AGAINST: WALTER P MEAGHER; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $5,048.95 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $310.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $5,358.95; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • DECLARATION RE: PURS TO CCP 1033(B) FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 02/01/2016
  • PLAINTIFF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $5,048.95

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • PRAYER FOR INTEREST PERCENTAGE RATE OF 0.00 PER ANNUM BEGINNING DATE OF 02/01/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. FOR 1ST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 160202-2380 $240.00; 160202-2380-CK Reference Number CK 012459

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S35

    Read MoreRead Less