This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/10/2018 at 06:11:14 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE-V-HERNANDEZ

Case Summary

On 12/14/2016 CAPITAL ONE-V-HERNANDEZ was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1749

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

Defendant

DAVID R HERNANDEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THE MOORE LAW GROUP

3710 S Susan Street Suite 210

Santa Ana, CA 92704

 

Court Documents

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON DAVID R HERNANDEZ; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/10/17 WITH COSTS OF $69.50 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON DAVID R HERNANDEZ; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/10/17 WITH COSTS OF $69.50 FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/26/2017
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 06/29/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON DAVID R HERNANDEZ; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/10/17 WITH COSTS OF $69.50 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $5,542.53

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • PRAYER FOR INTEREST PERCENTAGE RATE OF 0.00 PER ANNUM BEGINNING DATE OF 12/14/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 161221-0833 $240.00; 161221-0833-CK Reference Number 935027

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.