This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/03/2018 at 17:05:45 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE V FARRELL

Case Summary

On 02/06/2017 CAPITAL ONE filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against FARRELL. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2297

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.,

Defendant

JEANETTE L FARRELL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BLEIER & COX

16130 Ventura Blvd. Suite 620

Encino, CA 91436

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2017
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A., FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 170207-0474 $240.00; 170207-0474-CK Reference Number 015608

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.