This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/05/2018 at 10:09:18 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE -V- DE LA TORRE

Case Summary

On 07/11/2017 CAPITAL ONE -V- DE LA TORRE was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3347

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

Defendant

NATASHA DE LA TORRE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BLEIER & COX

16130 Ventura Blvd Penthouse Suite 620

Encino, CA 91436

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON NATASHA DE LA TORRE; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 07/29/17 WITH COSTS OF $70.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON NATASHA DE LA TORRE; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 07/29/17 WITH COSTS OF $70.00 FILED.

DECLARATION OF REGARDING NONMILITARY STATUS FILED

DECLARATION OF REGARDING NONMILITARY STATUS FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SACRAMENTO COUNTY ( 9069.27 ); Minutes; Receipt: 171115-0244 $25.00; 171115-0244-CK Reference Number 077161

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED; Minutes; Receipt: 171106-0836 $25.00; 171106-0836-CK Reference Number 075201

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • DECLARATION OF PLAS ATTORNEY RE NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 07/11/2017 OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 07/11/2017 OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. ORDERED ENTERED 09/11/17; JUDGMENT FOR: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.; JUDGMENT AGAINST: NATASHA DE LA TORRE; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $8,734.27 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $310.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $9,044.27; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 07/11/2017 OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. AS TO DOES ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON NATASHA DE LA TORRE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 07/11/2017 OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. AS TO NATASHA DE LA TORRE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • DECLARATION RE: PURSUANT TO CCP 1033 (B) FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/11/2017
  • VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 01/09/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON NATASHA DE LA TORRE; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 07/29/17 WITH COSTS OF $70.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF REGARDING NONMILITARY STATUS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. FOR FILING FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170713-0689 $240.00; 170713-0689-CK Reference Number 001732

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less