This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 03:28:11 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK-V-VIN

Case Summary

On 09/14/2017 CAPITAL ONE BANK-V-VIN was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7883

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

Defendant

THAWAN VIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BLEIER & COX

16130 Ventura Blvd. Suite 620

Encino, CA 91436

PATENAUDE & FELIX,A.P.C

16130 Ventura Blvd. Suite 620

Encino, CA 91436-2542

 

Court Documents

SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. ORDERED ENTERED 12/08/17; JUDGMENT FOR: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.; JUDGMENT AGAINST: THAWAN VIN; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $3,191.63 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $310.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $3,501.63; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

DECLARATION RE: CCP SECTION 1033 FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

DECLARATION RE: CCP SECTION 1033 FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFFS ATTY RE: NONMILITARY STATUS FILED

DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFFS ATTY RE: NONMILITARY STATUS FILED

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST THAWAN VIN FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST THAWAN VIN FILED.

DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. AS TO DOES ONLY

DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. AS TO DOES ONLY

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO THAWAN VIN SERVED ON 09/28/17 WITH FEES OF $70.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO THAWAN VIN SERVED ON 09/28/17 WITH FEES OF $70.00.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

DECLARATION RE: OF PLAINTIFFS ATTORNEY REGARDING NONMILITARY STAT FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

DECLARATION RE: OF PLAINTIFFS ATTORNEY REGARDING NONMILITARY STAT FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO ORANGE COUNTY ( 3623.40 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • WRIT FEE OF $25.00 PAID; Minutes; Receipt: 180801-0383 $25.00; 180801-0383-CK Reference Number 093110

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $96.77) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY ( 3533.40 ); Minutes; Receipt: 180531-0739 $25.00; 180531-0739-CK Reference Number 090123

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $6.77) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OF BLEIER & COX FOR CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. CHANGES ITS NAME TO PATENAUDE & FELIX,A.P.C FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. ORDERED ENTERED 12/08/17; JUDGMENT FOR: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.; JUDGMENT AGAINST: THAWAN VIN; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $3,191.63 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $310.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $3,501.63; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: CCP SECTION 1033 FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 09/14/2017
  • PLAINTIFF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $3,191.63

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 170915-0007 $240.00; 170915-0007-CK Reference Number 002343

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: OF PLAINTIFFS ATTORNEY REGARDING NONMILITARY STAT FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant