This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 04:25:42 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK -V- VIDAL

Case Summary

On 09/14/2017 CAPITAL ONE BANK -V- VIDAL was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8098

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

Defendant

EDGAR VIDAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUNT & HENRIQUES

151 Bernal Rd Suite 8

San Jose, CA 95119

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON EDGAR VIDAL; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/13/17 WITH COSTS OF $59.50 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON EDGAR VIDAL; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/13/17 WITH COSTS OF $59.50 FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED; Minutes; Receipt: 170918-0963 $240.00; 170918-0963-CK Reference Number 736532

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. FILED

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. ORDERED ENTERED 12/27/17; JUDGMENT FOR: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.; JUDGMENT AGAINST: EDGAR VIDAL; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,648.19 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $299.50 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,947.69; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

DECLARATION RE: INTEREST, CCP1033, ATTORNEY FEES FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

DECLARATION RE: INTEREST, CCP1033, ATTORNEY FEES FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST EDGAR VIDAL FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST EDGAR VIDAL FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. FOR ABSTRACT; Minutes; Receipt: 180112-0303 $25.00; 180112-0303-CK Reference Number CK-766182

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST EDGAR VIDAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. AS TO EDGAR VIDAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: INTEREST, CCP1033, ATTORNEY FEES FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. ORDERED ENTERED 12/27/17; JUDGMENT FOR: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.; JUDGMENT AGAINST: EDGAR VIDAL; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,648.19 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $299.50 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,947.69; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 03/19/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON EDGAR VIDAL; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/13/17 WITH COSTS OF $59.50 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED; Minutes; Receipt: 170918-0963 $240.00; 170918-0963-CK Reference Number 736532

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less