This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 04:23:51 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK -V- GRASER

Case Summary

On 09/14/2017 CAPITAL ONE BANK -V- GRASER was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8079

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

Defendant

SCOTT E GRASER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUNT & HENRIQUES

151 Bernal Rd Suite 8

San Jose, CA 95119

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION RE: INTEREST; COSTS(CCP 1033); ATTORNEY FEES FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

DECLARATION RE: INTEREST; COSTS(CCP 1033); ATTORNEY FEES FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED; Minutes; Receipt: 170918-0830 $240.00; 170918-0830-CK Reference Number 736510

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. FILED

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. ORDERED ENTERED 12/28/17; JUDGMENT FOR: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.; JUDGMENT AGAINST: SCOTT E GRASER; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $3,416.99 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $299.50 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $3,716.49; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO SCOTT E GRASER SERVED ON 10/06/17 WITH FEES OF $59.50.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO SCOTT E GRASER SERVED ON 10/06/17 WITH FEES OF $59.50.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON SCOTT E GRASER.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON SCOTT E GRASER.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( 3741.49 ); Minutes; Receipt: 180208-0717 $25.00; 180208-0717-CK Reference Number 773209

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. FOR ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 180129-0826 $25.00; 180129-0826-CK Reference Number 767179

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON SCOTT E GRASER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. AS TO SCOTT E GRASER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: INTEREST; COSTS(CCP 1033); ATTORNEY FEES FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. ORDERED ENTERED 12/28/17; JUDGMENT FOR: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.; JUDGMENT AGAINST: SCOTT E GRASER; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $3,416.99 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $299.50 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $3,716.49; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 03/19/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO SCOTT E GRASER SERVED ON 10/06/17 WITH FEES OF $59.50.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED; Minutes; Receipt: 170918-0830 $240.00; 170918-0830-CK Reference Number 736510

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less