This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 04:23:31 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK -V- GARFIAS

Case Summary

On 09/14/2017 CAPITAL ONE BANK -V- GARFIAS was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8075

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

Defendant

JOSE A GARFIAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUNT & HENRIQUES

151 Bernal Rd Suite 8

San Jose, CA 95119

 

Court Documents

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED; Minutes; Receipt: 170918-0775 $240.00; 170918-0775-CK Reference Number 736509

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO JOSE A GARFIAS WITH COSTS OF $59.50

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO JOSE A GARFIAS WITH COSTS OF $59.50

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO JOSE A GARFIAS SERVED ON 01/23/18 WITH FEES OF $59.50.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO JOSE A GARFIAS SERVED ON 01/23/18 WITH FEES OF $59.50.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED; Minutes; Receipt: 180522-0434 $25.00; 180522-0434-CK Reference Number 801269

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • DECLARATION RE: INTEREST, COSTS CCP 1033 & ATTORNEY FEES FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. ORDERED ENTERED 04/30/18; JUDGMENT FOR: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JOSE A GARFIAS; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,822.45 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $299.50 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $3,121.95; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST JOSE A GARFIAS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. AS TO JOSE A GARFIAS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 03/19/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO JOSE A GARFIAS SERVED ON 01/23/18 WITH FEES OF $59.50.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO JOSE A GARFIAS WITH COSTS OF $59.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED; Minutes; Receipt: 170918-0775 $240.00; 170918-0775-CK Reference Number 736509

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less