This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 12/13/2021 at 23:11:15 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK -V- FRANK E BAILOR

Case Summary

On 09/14/2010 CAPITAL ONE BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against FRANK E BAILOR. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Needles Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0056

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK

Defendant

BAILOR, FRANK E

Not Yet Classified

CONV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUNT & HENRIQUES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

09/06/2011

DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2011

DocketOSC Re: Status of Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740; Original Type: OSC Re: Status of Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/08/2011

DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/08/2011

DocketOSC Re: Service Completion Pursuant to CRC 3.740; Original Type: OSC Re: Service Completion Pursuant to CRC 3.740; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/04/2011

FinancialCONV; Counter Payment; Receipt # 20110304-1840; ConversionPayment; $25.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/04/2011

FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $25.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/04/2011

DocketAbstract of Judgment Issued; Comment: ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED 110304-1840-CK MJF/ 25.00 PAYMT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/16/2011

DispositionJudgment; Judgment Type: Judgment; Comment; Comment: (9/14/2010 - 0001 - CMComplaint); Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To: CAPITAL ONE BANK; Awarded Against: BAILOR, FRANK E; Amount; Damages: $0.00; Pre-Judgment Interest: $310.34; Attorney Fees: $0.00; Costs: $279.00; Other: $4,316.56; Other Comment: Principle; Total: $4905.90

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/16/2011

DocketJudgment on Complaint Filed; Comment: JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT OF CAPITAL ONE BANK FILED JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT OF CAPITAL ONE BANK ORDERED ENTERED 02/16/11 JUDGMENT FOR: CAPITAL ONE BANK JUDGMENT AGAINST: FRANK E BAILOR JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $4,316.56 INTEREST $310.34 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $279.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00. JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $4905.90 STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) CASE COMPLETE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/16/2011

DocketMiscellaneous Document Filed; Comment: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANTS UNJUST ENRICHMENT CLAIM (DISMISSAL NOT ENTERED) FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
09/15/2010

FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $220.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2010

DocketCase Number Changed; Comment: CASE NUMBER CHANGED FROM CIV/NS10000056

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2010

DocketFee Payment; Comment: FEE PAYMENT 100915-0261-CK CLT/ 220.00 PAYMT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2010

FinancialCONV; Total Financial Assessment: $250.00; Total Payments and Credits: $250.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2010

DocketParties Referred to Alternate Dispute Resolution; Comment: PARTIES REFERRED TO ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2010

DocketCertificate of Assignment Received; Comment: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2010

DocketCase Assigned for All Purposes; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT N1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2010

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed; Comment: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2010

DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Comment: SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2010

DocketCase and Party Information added; Comment: CASE AND PARTY INFORMATION ADDED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less