This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/03/2018 at 16:39:30 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK V DUARTE

Case Summary

On 02/06/2017 CAPITAL ONE BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DUARTE. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2173

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

Defendant

EUNICE DUARTE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BLEIER & COX

16130 Ventura Blvd. Suite 620

Encino, CA 91436

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2018
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $40.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. FOR WRIT OF EXECUTION FOR LA CO; Minutes; Receipt: 171031-0406 $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY ( 3368.20 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $65.77) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. FOR ABSTRACT; Minutes; Receipt: 170516-0636 $25.00; 170516-0636-CK Reference Number CK#067293

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • DECLARATION OF PLA ATTY RE:NONMILITARY STATUS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 02/06/2017 OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 02/06/2017 OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. ORDERED ENTERED 04/20/17; JUDGMENT FOR: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.; JUDGMENT AGAINST: EUNICE DUARTE; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,967.43 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $310.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $3,277.43; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 04/20/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 02/06/2017 OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. AS TO EUNICE DUARTE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 08/07/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO EUNICE DUARTE SERVED ON 02/28/17 WITH FEES OF $70.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2017
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. FOR FIRST APPEARANCE; Minutes; Receipt: 170207-0147 $240.00; 170207-0147-CK Reference Number 015611

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.