This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/11/2018 at 23:04:56 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK -V- DELAROSA

Case Summary

On 05/04/2011 CAPITAL ONE BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DELAROSA. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5814

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N .A.

Defendant

YVETTE DELAROSA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEGAL RECOVERY LAWOFFICES, INC

5030 Camino De La Siesta, #340

San Diego, CA 92108

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2016
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM RIVERSIDE COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $624.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2014
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM RIVERSIDE COUNTY FILED 09/05/14 WITH COSTS OF $30.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2013
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY ( $3375.93 ); Minutes; Receipt: 131120-0950 $25.00; 131120-0950-CK Reference Number 127918

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2013
  • DECLARATION RE: CREDITS IN THE AMOUNT OF $913.77 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2013
  • COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED WITH COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $108.50 AND INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $789.36

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2013
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY ( 3391.84 ); Minutes; Receipt: 130417-1826 $25.00; 130417-1826-CK Reference Number 105931

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2012
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2011
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED; Minutes; Receipt: 111117-0887 $25.00; 111117-0887-CK Reference Number 32320

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2011
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2011
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/04/2011 OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N .A. FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/04/2011 OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N .A. ORDERED ENTERED 06/24/11; JUDGMENT FOR: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N .A.; JUDGMENT AGAINST: YVETTE DELAROSA; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,552.92 INTEREST $104.23 ATTORNEY FEES $405.19 COSTS $304.50 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $3,366.84; COMPLAINT DISPOSITIONED BY JUDGMENT.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 06/24/2011
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/04/2011 OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N .A. AS TO YVETTE DELAROSA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2011
  • DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/04/2011 OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N .A. AS TO DOES ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2011
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON YVETTE DELAROSA; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 05/07/11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2011
  • VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 11/04/11 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S34.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S34

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • AFFIDAVIT OF VENUE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CASE AND PARTY INFORMATION ADDED; Minutes; Receipt: 110504-2954 $240.00; 110504-2954-CK Reference Number #176707

    Read MoreRead Less