This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/07/2018 at 11:11:50 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK -V- DEANNA K WADE

Case Summary

On 02/01/2016 CAPITAL ONE BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DEANNA K WADE. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1405

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) ,N.A.

Defendant

DEANNA K WADE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BLEIER & COX

16130 Ventura Blvd. Suite 620

Encino, CA 91436

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2017
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) ,N.A. FOR WRIT; Minutes; Receipt: 161129-0682 $25.00; 161129-0682-CK Reference Number CK#056956

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY ( 6076.95 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $86.90) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2016
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) ,N.A. FOR ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 160509-0664 $25.00; 160509-0664-CK Reference Number CK 040244

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2016
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 02/01/2016 OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) ,N.A. FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 02/01/2016 OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) ,N.A. ORDERED ENTERED 04/18/16; JUDGMENT FOR: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) ,N.A.; JUDGMENT AGAINST: DEANNA K WADE; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $5,655.05 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $310.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $5,965.05; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2016
  • DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFFS ATTORNEY RE NONMILITARY STATUS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 04/18/2016
  • DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 02/01/2016 OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) ,N.A. AS TO DOES ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 08/02/16 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S35.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO DEANNA K WADE SERVED ON 02/25/16 WITH FEES OF $70.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) ,N.A. FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 160202-1457 $240.00; 160202-1457-CK Reference Number 012437

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S35

    Read MoreRead Less