This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/03/2018 at 16:06:26 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK-V-DE ALWIS

Case Summary

On 01/31/2017 CAPITAL ONE BANK-V-DE ALWIS was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2030

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

Defendant

SHANTHI M DE ALWIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THE MOORE LAW GROUP

3710 S Susan St. Suite 210

Santa Ana, CA 92799-5154

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED; Minutes; Receipt: 170714-0727 $25.00; 170714-0727-CK Reference Number 950189

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 01/31/2017 OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 01/31/2017 OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. ORDERED ENTERED 04/21/17; JUDGMENT FOR: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.; JUDGMENT AGAINST: SHANTHI M DE ALWIS; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $3,318.77 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $305.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $3,623.77; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • DECLARATION RE: ISO APPL FOR ENTRY OF DEF JDGMT CCP 585 FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • DECLARATION RE: ISO ENTRY OF JUDGMENT RE: COMPLIANCE CCP 1033 FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON SHANTHI M DE ALWIS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 01/31/2017 OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. AS TO SHANTHI M DE ALWIS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 08/01/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON SHANTHI M DE ALWIS; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 02/22/17 WITH COSTS OF $65.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $3,318.77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. FOR FILING FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170206-0632 $240.00; 170206-0632-CK Reference Number 938682

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.