This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/10/2018 at 05:01:25 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA)-V-REINERIO E LAINEZ

Case Summary

On 12/14/2016 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA -V-REINERIO E LAINEZ was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1337

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA

Defendant

REINERIO E LAINEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BLEIER & COX

16130 Ventura Blvd Ste 620

Encino, CA 91436-2568

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2017
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): COMPLAINT HAS BEEN DISMISSED AS OF 020717, CAN NOT STAY CASE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY REINERIO E LAINEZ FOR FAX FILING; Minutes; Receipt: 170217-0083 $5.00; 170217-0083-MC Reference Number 072834

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • PLAINTIFF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 161216-0275 $240.00; 161216-0275-CK Reference Number 015188

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $3,486.91

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • PRAYER FOR INTEREST PERCENTAGE RATE OF 0% PER ANNUM BEGINNING DATE OF 12/14/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.