This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 07:13:30 (UTC).

CAPITAL FINANCIAL-V-FONDARIO

Case Summary

On 07/03/2018 CAPITAL FINANCIAL-V-FONDARIO was filed as an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9525

  • Filing Date:

    07/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL FINANCIAL CREDIT, LLC

Defendant

KIM FONDARIO

Assignee

GOLD LINE CREDIT SERVICES, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VIJAY S DESAI

390 West Cerritos Avenue

Anaheim, CA 92807

Assignee Attorneys

MICHAEL K SIPES,ATTORNEY AT LAW

10971 Sun Center Dr. Suite 200

Rancho Cordova, CA 95670

LAW OFFICES OF MICHAEL K SPIES

P.O. Box 1700

Folsom, CA 95763

 

Court Documents

RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED.

RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED.; Minutes; ORIGINAL JUDGMENT ENTERED 08/27/08 IS ORDERED RENEWED AS FOLLOWS:; IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED THAT GOLD LINE CREDIT SERVICES, INC HAVE &; RECOVER FROM KIM FONDARIO:; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $5,899.63 INTEREST $5,107.70 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $30.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $11,037.33; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OTHER CLERK JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OTHER CLERK JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

MEMO OF COSTS FILED BY GOLD LINE CREDIT SERVICES, INC, FOR 0.00 COSTS AND 5899.63 INTEREST.

MEMO OF COSTS FILED BY GOLD LINE CREDIT SERVICES, INC, FOR 0.00 COSTS AND 5899.63 INTEREST.

ORIGINAL CASE WITH JDGMNT CIVRS803371 (IMAGED)

ORIGINAL CASE WITH JDGMNT CIVRS803371 (IMAGED)

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. COPY FILED.

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. COPY FILED.

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT RETURNED AND FILED.

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT RETURNED AND FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT SERVED ON 08/10/18.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT SERVED ON 08/10/18.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $178.41)

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $178.41)

ORDER ON AFFIDAVIT OF IDENTITY FILED

ORDER ON AFFIDAVIT OF IDENTITY FILED

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $749.93)

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $749.93)

WRIT RETURNED UNSATISFIED FROM SOLANO COUNTY WITH COSTS OF $120.00.

WRIT RETURNED UNSATISFIED FROM SOLANO COUNTY WITH COSTS OF $120.00.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT RETURNED UNSATISFIED FROM SOLANO COUNTY WITH COSTS OF $120.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • DocketWRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( IN THE AMOUNT OF 11812.26 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • DocketWRIT FEE OF $25.00 PAID; Minutes; Receipt: 190509-0771 $25.00; 190509-0771-CK Reference Number 8069

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $749.93)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON AFFIDAVIT OF IDENTITY FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • DocketON RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED 07/03/2018 OF CAPITAL FINANCIAL CREDIT, LLC FOR KIM FONDARIO, ADD KIM WILEY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • Docket** VOID ** FEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • DocketFILING FEE PAID BY CAPITAL FINANCIAL CREDIT, LLC FOR FAX/POST/ENVLP/COPY FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 190321-0332 $7.72

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • DocketWRIT FEE OF $25.00 PAID; Minutes; Receipt: 181010-0738 $25.00; 181010-0738-CK Reference Number 7015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • DocketWRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SOLANO COUNTY ( $11,240.74 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $178.41)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT SERVED ON 08/10/18.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT RETURNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. COPY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • DocketFILING FEE PAID BY GOLD LINE CREDIT SERVICES, INC FOR ROJ; Minutes; Receipt: 180727-0651 $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL CASE WITH JDGMNT CIVRS803371 (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMO OF COSTS FILED BY GOLD LINE CREDIT SERVICES, INC, FOR 0.00 COSTS AND 5899.63 INTEREST.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED.; Minutes; ORIGINAL JUDGMENT ENTERED 08/27/08 IS ORDERED RENEWED AS FOLLOWS:; IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED THAT GOLD LINE CREDIT SERVICES, INC HAVE &; RECOVER FROM KIM FONDARIO:; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $5,899.63 INTEREST $5,107.70 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $30.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $11,037.33; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OTHER CLERK JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OTHER CLERK JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAPITAL FINANCIAL CREDIT LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where GOLD LINE CREDIT SERVICES INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SIPES, MICHAEL K