This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/23/2021 at 07:43:49 (UTC).

CAMPUS VS MORALES

Case Summary

On 02/26/2020 CAMPUS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MORALES. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Agron, Joel. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1233

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judge

Agron, Joel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAMPUS AVENUE FEE OWNER LLC

Defendants

MORALES, BONITA

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Not Yet Classified

CONV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Khalidy, Kareem M

 

Court Documents

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT -$10,000 FILED. SUMMON

02/26/2020: UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT -$10,000 FILED. SUMMON

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

02/26/2020: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

Status Conference - Unlawful Detainer

02/26/2020: Status Conference - Unlawful Detainer

Proof of Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint

06/19/2020: Proof of Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint

Proof of Service of Pre Judgment Claim

06/19/2020: Proof of Service of Pre Judgment Claim

Request to Enter Default Filed

06/19/2020: Request to Enter Default Filed

Default Previously Entered, Reqst for Court Judgmt Under CCP

06/19/2020: Default Previously Entered, Reqst for Court Judgmt Under CCP

Declaration re: Reqst for Court Judgment under CCP585D Filed

06/19/2020: Declaration re: Reqst for Court Judgment under CCP585D Filed

Declaration & Order re:

06/23/2020: Declaration & Order re:

Money Judgment After 585 Declaration Filed

06/23/2020: Money Judgment After 585 Declaration Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2020
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Agron, Joel; Judgment Type: Court Default Judgment (585) LLT; Party; Names; CONV; CAMPUS AVENUE FEE OWNER LLC; MORALES, BONITA; ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; Unlawful Detainer; Awarded To: CAMPUS AVENUE FEE OWNER LLC; Awarded Against: MORALES, BONITA; Must Pay; Past Due Rent: $1,294.00; Holdover Damages: $1,078.25; Attorney Fees: $500.00; Costs: $281.40; Total: $3,153.65

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff Prevails

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMoney Judgment After 585 Declaration Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration & Order re:; Comment: LOST ORIGINAL LEASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration re: Reqst for Court Judgment under CCP585D Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault Previously Entered, Reqst for Court Judgmt Under CCP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Pre Judgment Claim

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint; Comment: Filed with Costs

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketDocument Received; Comment: 585

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketCase Ordered Confidential per AB2819

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • FinancialCONV; Counter Payment; Receipt # 20200226-0620; ConversionPayment; $255.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $255.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • FinancialCONV; Total Financial Assessment: $255.00; Total Payments and Credits: $255.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus Conference - Unlawful Detainer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketPast Due Rent is:; Comment: PAST DUE RENT IS $1,294.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketDeclaration of Daily Rental Value Filed-Daily Rental Value; Comment: DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $43.13.--BEGINNING ON 03/01/20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed; Comment: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned for All Purposes; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT F6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Complaint of <$10,000 Filed; Comment: UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED. 200226-0620-CK CUE/ 255.00 PAYMT 200226-0620-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 572565

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less