This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 07:28:48 (UTC).

CAMPOS-V-FORD

Case Summary

On 09/29/2017 CAMPOS-V-FORD was filed as a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9196

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ROBIN CAMPOS

STEVEN R. CAMPOS

Defendant

FORD MOTOR COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KNIGHT LAW GROUP LLP

10250 Constellation Blvd Ste 2500

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Defendant Attorney

GORDON REES SCULLYMANSUKHANI,LLP

Embarcadero Center West 275 Battery St--#2000

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING SET SENT.

NOTICE OF HEARING SET SENT.; Minutes; A HEARING HAS BEEN SET RE STATUS OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT ON 04/30/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT; S26; NOTICES PRINTED

NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT FILED BY FORD MOTOR COMPANY. FEDERAL NUMBER UNKNOWN.

NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT FILED BY FORD MOTOR COMPANY. FEDERAL NUMBER UNKNOWN.

ANSWER FILED BY FORD MOTOR COMPANY; PARTY REPRESENTED BY GORDON REES SCULLYMANSUKHANI,LLP.

ANSWER FILED BY FORD MOTOR COMPANY; PARTY REPRESENTED BY GORDON REES SCULLYMANSUKHANI,LLP.; Minutes; Receipt: 171023-0853 $435.00; 171023-0853-CK Reference Number 107652

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON FORD MOTOR COMPANY; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/03/17 WITH COSTS OF $39.95 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON FORD MOTOR COMPANY; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/03/17 WITH COSTS OF $39.95 FILED.

AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF STEVEN CAMPOS

AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF STEVEN CAMPOS

SUMMONS ISSUED ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF STEVEN CAMPOS - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF STEVEN CAMPOS - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY STEVEN R. CAMPOS, ROBIN CAMPOS

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY STEVEN R. CAMPOS, ROBIN CAMPOS

DECLARATION RE: VENUE FOR CONSUMERS LEGAL REMEDIES (ROBIN CAMPOS) FILED BY ROBIN CAMPOS

DECLARATION RE: VENUE FOR CONSUMERS LEGAL REMEDIES (ROBIN CAMPOS) FILED BY ROBIN CAMPOS

DECLARATION RE: VENUE FOR CONSUMERS LEGAL REMEDIES FILED BY STEVEN R. CAMPOS

DECLARATION RE: VENUE FOR CONSUMERS LEGAL REMEDIES FILED BY STEVEN R. CAMPOS

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2018
  • HEARING RE: STATUS OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DAVID COHN, JUDGE; CLERK: NADYA AVAKIAN; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT CHRISTIAN HERNANDEZ; APPEARANCES:; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY ATTORNEY LAVONNA HAYASHI FOR KNIGHT LAW GROUP LLP FOR PLAINTIFF.; ATTORNEY RUSSELL MORTYN APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR FORD MOTOR COMPANY.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; ACTION CAME ON FOR STATUS OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT.; REPORTER WAIVED; COURT FINDS:; NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT WAS FILED 10/31/17. THIS COURT NO LONGER HAS JURISDICTION; TO PROCEED WITH THIS ACTION.; COURT ORDERS ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. REASON: HIGHER COURT.; IF MATTER IS REMANDED BACK TO STATE COURT, JURISDICTION WOULD BE REVIVED AND THE MATTER; WILL BE PLACED BACK ON CALENDAR UNDER THE SAME CASE NUMBER.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY FORD MOTOR COMPANY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY STEVEN R. CAMPOS, ROBIN CAMPOS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • VACATE TSCCV HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 03/29/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S26.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING SET SENT.; Minutes; A HEARING HAS BEEN SET RE STATUS OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT ON 04/30/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT; S26; NOTICES PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT FILED BY FORD MOTOR COMPANY. FEDERAL NUMBER UNKNOWN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • MATTER STAYED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY FIRST PAPER FEE PAID IN FULL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY FORD MOTOR COMPANY; PARTY REPRESENTED BY GORDON REES SCULLYMANSUKHANI,LLP.; Minutes; Receipt: 171023-0853 $435.00; 171023-0853-CK Reference Number 107652

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 09/29/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY STEVEN R. CAMPOS FOR 1ST APPEARANCE; Minutes; Receipt: 170929-0754 $435.00; 170929-0754-CK Reference Number CK 3576742

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY STEVEN R. CAMPOS, ROBIN CAMPOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: VENUE FOR CONSUMERS LEGAL REMEDIES (ROBIN CAMPOS) FILED BY ROBIN CAMPOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: VENUE FOR CONSUMERS LEGAL REMEDIES FILED BY STEVEN R. CAMPOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.