This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 01:40:26 (UTC).

CAMDEN -v- FUSS

Case Summary

On 05/24/2017 CAMDEN filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against FUSS. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3584

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAMDEN LANDMARK, LLC

Defendants

ANYA FUSS

MATT FUSS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HELAINE S. ASHTON

2040 Main Street Suite 500

Irvine, CA 92614

 

Court Documents

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170524-0477 $255.00; 170524-0477-CK Reference Number 534082

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON MATT FUSS, ANYA FUSS.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON MATT FUSS, ANYA FUSS.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON ANYA FUSS; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 05/25/17

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON ANYA FUSS; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 05/25/17

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON MATT FUSS; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 05/25/17

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON MATT FUSS; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 05/25/17

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 05/24/2017 OF CAMDEN LANDMARK, LLC ORDERED ENTERED 06/01/17; JUDGMENT FOR: CAMDEN LANDMARK, LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: MATT FUSS, ANYA FUSS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: MATT FUSS, ANYA FUSS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( PLACED IN SHERIFFS BIN)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( PLACED IN SHERIFFS BIN)

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( PLACED IN SHERIFFS BIN)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • WRIT FEE OF $25.00 PAID; Minutes; Receipt: 170602-0348 $25.00; 170602-0348-CK Reference Number 534327

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 05/24/2017 OF CAMDEN LANDMARK, LLC AS TO MATT FUSS, ANYA FUSS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 05/24/2017 OF CAMDEN LANDMARK, LLC ORDERED ENTERED 06/01/17; JUDGMENT FOR: CAMDEN LANDMARK, LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: MATT FUSS, ANYA FUSS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: MATT FUSS, ANYA FUSS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON MATT FUSS; PARTY SERVED ON 05/25/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $55.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON ANYA FUSS; PARTY SERVED ON 05/25/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $55.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON MATT FUSS, ANYA FUSS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $1,828.41

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $64.81.--BEGINNING ON 06/01/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170524-0477 $255.00; 170524-0477-CK Reference Number 534082

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT F8

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAMDEN LANDMARK, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ASHTON, HELAINE S