This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/07/2018 at 15:25:03 (UTC).

CAMACHO-V-FAIRFIELD INN, ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/30/2011 CAMACHO-V-FAIRFIELD INN was filed as a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Joshua Tree District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0463

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Joshua Tree District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NANCY LOPEZ

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

LEONARD YOUNG

WKM COMPANIES, INC.

CANYON HOSPITALITYCONSTRUCTION, INC.

DANIEL T MUZQUIZ

K PARTNERS HOTEL MANAGEMENT CORP

US DIVERSIFIED CALINC.

K PARTNERS HOTEL MANAGEMENT

COAST SIGN, INC.

WKM COMPANIES, LP

K-PARTNERS 29 PALMS, LP

K-PARTNERS TWNETYNINE PALMS, LP

WKM DEVELOPMENT, LLC

Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

US DIVERSIFIED CAL, INC.

LEONARD YOUNG

WKM COMPANIES, INC.

CANYON HOSPITALITYCONSTRUCTION, INC.

DANIEL T MUZQUIZ

K PARTNERS HOTEL MANAGEMENT CORP

K-PARTNERS 29 PALMS LP

TRULITE SIGNS , INC

K PARTNERS HOTEL MANAGEMENT

K PARTNERS HOPSITALITY GROUP LP

COAST SIGN, INC.

WKM COMPANIES, LP

TRUE LITE SIGNS, INC.

K PARTNERS HOTEL MANAGEMENT GROUP LP

THE BURLINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY

WKM DEVELOPMENT, LLC

64 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHURMER & DRANE

500 Esplanade Drive Suite 1540

Oxnard, CA 93030

Cross Defendant, Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF J ALAN PLOTT, APC

57365 29 Palms Hwy. Ste C

Yucca Valley, CA 92284

MORRIS POLICH & PURDY

1055 W Seventh St 24Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

YOKA AND SMITH

445 South Figueroa Street 38Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

WADE & LOWE

3200 Inland Empire Boulevard Suite 160

Ontario, CA 91764

HENGESBACH & DAWSON

901 Via Piemonte Ste 230

Ontario, CA 91764

LAW OFFICES OF PATRICK J MCDONOUGH

Po Box 51457 3633 E Inland Empire Blvd #450

Ontario, CA 91764

MARSHALL & FRENCH

17901 Von Karman Avenue Suite 300

Irvine, CA 92614-5240

MIDDLEBROOK KAISERHENGESBACH & DAWSON

901 Via Piemonte Suite 230

Ontario, CA 91764

LAW OFFICES OF HENGESBACH & DAWSON

901 Via Piemonte Suite 230

Ontario, CA 91764

WATERS, MCCLUSKEY & BOEHLE

200 North Sepulveda Boulevard Suite 300

El Segundo, CA 90245

WESTON & MCELVAIN

601 S. Figueroa St. Suite 2350

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Other Attorneys

DIEDERICH & ASSOCIATES

655 North Central Ave Suite 2000

Glendale, CA 91203

LAW OFFICES OF J. ALAN PLOTT, APC

57365 Twentynine Palms Highway Suite C

Yucca Valley, CA 92284

ROSENGARTEN & ASSOCIATES

28632 Roadside Drive Suite 212

Agoura Hills, CA 91301

WAXLER, CARNER, BRODSKY LLP

1960 East Grand Avenue Suite 1210

El Segundo, CA 90245

BURNHAM BROWN, A PROFESSIONAL LAW CORPORATI

1901 Harrison Street 14Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94612

TYSON & MENDES

5661 La Jolla Blvd

La Jolla, CA 92037

KEVIN PATRICK MCVERRY ATTY AT LAW

751 Daily Drive Suite 325

Camarillo, CA 93010

MURCHISON & CUMMING

18201 Von Karman Ave. Suite 1100

Irvine, CA 92612-1077

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2015
  • HEARING RE: JURY TRIAL ON X-COMPLAINTS OF BURNS SEPTIC; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • READINESS CALENDAR; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2015
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2015
  • FILING FEE PAID BY US DIVERSIFIED CALINC FOR FAX FILING; Minutes; Receipt: 150519-1961 $3.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2015
  • CREDIT CARD TRANSACTION ID NUMBER 023-0229387917

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2015
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AS TO (2) CROSS COMPLAINTS IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): CROSS COMPLAINTS ALREADY DISMISSED ON 04/27/15 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2015
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2015
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL TO CROSS COMPLAINT IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): NO SUCH STATED CROSS COMPLAINT HAVE BEEN FILED; CO RRECT, R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2015
  • FILING FEE PAID BY BURNS SEPTIC AND SEWER SERVICE FOR FAX FILING; Minutes; Receipt: 150514-0775 $3.00; 150514-0775-VS Reference Number 230815

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2015
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
648 More Docket Entries
  • 07/18/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON US DIVERSIFIED CALINC.; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 07/12/11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON US DIVERSIFIED CALINC.; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 07/13/11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON K PARTNERS HOTEL MANAGEMENT CORP.; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 07/08/11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2011
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 110701-1419 $395.00; 110701-1419-CK Reference Number 2149

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT M4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2011
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2011
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2011
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2011
  • PARTIES REFERRED TO ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2011
  • ADA MEMO ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.