This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 12/28/2021 at 17:07:39 (UTC).

CALIFORNIA SERVICE -V- KAUR

Case Summary

On 10/13/2015 CALIFORNIA SERVICE filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against KAUR. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Dest, Michael M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5143

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judge

Dest, Michael M

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

KAUR, SANDEEP

Not Yet Classified

CONV

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION OF MICHAEL K. SPIES RE-VENUE FILED

10/13/2015: DECLARATION OF MICHAEL K. SPIES RE-VENUE FILED

COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP632

10/13/2015: COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP632

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

10/13/2015: SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

10/13/2015: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

10/13/2015: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE IMAGED

10/13/2015: NOTICE IMAGED

DECLARATION RE- REDUCED FILING FEES BP6322.1(C)(1)

10/13/2015: DECLARATION RE- REDUCED FILING FEES BP6322.1(C)(1)

OSC RE- SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740 MI

04/08/2016: OSC RE- SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740 MI

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE. - STA

04/18/2016: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE. - STA

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2016
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • DocketOSC Re: Status of Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740; Original Type: OSC Re: Status of Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE:SANCTIONS(PLTF CNSL FTA 4/8/16 & UNSVD DEFT)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Predisposition; Original Type: Order to Show Cause - Predisposition; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE:SANCTIONS(PLTF CNSL FTA 4/8/16 & UNSVD DEFT)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2016
  • DispositionJudgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Request for Dismissal; Comment; Comment: (REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Filed; Comment: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE. - STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AFTER OTHER ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AFTER OTHER ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Judicial Officer: Dest, Michael M; Comment: OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740 MICHAEL M DEST,JUDGE CLERK: SULMA TORRES NOT REPORTED COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA - APPEARANCES: NO APPEARANCE. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED 08:32 CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED. PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD COURT NOTES PLAINTIFF COUNSEL FAILS TO APPEAR OR CONTACT THE COURT AS TO NON APPEARANCE FOR TODAYS HEARING. COURT ORDERS THIS MATTER SET FOR ORDER SHOW CAUSE AS TO WHY SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $50.00 SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AT TODAY'S HEARING AND ALSO $50.00 FOR FAILING TO COMPLY WITH CRC 3.740(E). - HEARINGS: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : SANCTIONS(PLTF CNSL FTA 4/8/16 & UNSVD DEFT) SET FOR 05/10/16 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S35. NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF MINUTE ORDER FROM 4/8/16 HEARING TO COUNSEL OF RECORD. 08:32 ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END ===

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • DocketOSC Re: Service Completion Pursuant to CRC 3.740; Original Type: OSC Re: Service Completion Pursuant to CRC 3.740; Judicial Officer: Dest, Michael M; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • DocketCase Transferred to New Department; Comment: CASE TRANSFERRED TO NEW DEPARTMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • DocketCase Transferred to New Department; Comment: CASE TRANSFERRED TO NEW DEPARTMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 10/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Imaged; Comment: NOTICE IMAGED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received; Comment: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • DocketCase Assigned for All Purposes; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S33

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed; Comment: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Comment: SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Filed. (Limited Jurisdiction - Dec BP6322.1(c)(1)); Comment: COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: FILING FEE PAID BY CALIFORNIA SERVICEBUREAU, INC. FOR 1ST APPEARANCE FEES 151014-2721-CK CDL/ 181.00 PAYMT 151014-2722-CK CDL/ 15.00 PAYMT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • DocketPrayer for Interest Percentage at the Rate of; Comment: PRAYER FOR INTEREST PERCENTAGE RATE OF 10.00 PER ANNUM BEGINNING DATE OF 10/13/15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • DocketPrayed for Amount and/or Damages in the Amount of; Comment: PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $3,017.67

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Filed; Comment: DECLARATION OF MICHAEL K. SPIES RE:VENUE FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONV is a litigant