This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/10/2018 at 01:58:29 (UTC).

CALIFORNIA INSURANCE -v- SHINIH

Case Summary

On 12/01/2016 CALIFORNIA INSURANCE filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against SHINIH. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0320

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CALIFORNIA INSURANCE GUARANTEEASSOCIATION

EULALIO CHAVEZ

Claimant

LUMBERMEN'S UNDERWRITING ALLIANCE,

Defendants

SHINIH ENTERPRISES

SHINIH USA, INC.

VFT INC

SHINIH ENTERPRISESCO., LTD.

AMERICAN OUTDOOR LIVING INC

AMERICAN NONWOVENS, INC.

TRI-STATE EMPLOYMENT SERVICES,INC.

Intervenor and Plaintiff

EULALIO CHAVEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Intervenor Attorneys

BENTHALE MCKIBBIN & MCKNIGHT

1450 Iowa Avenue Suite 210

Riverside, CA 92507-0508

ANDAL LAW GROUP

1748 W Katella Ave; Ste 200

Orange, CA 92867

Claimant Attorney

DIETZ, GILMOR & CHAZEN

249 E Ocean Blvd #1000

Long Beach, CA 90802

Defendant Attorneys

MULCAHY LLP

4 Park Plaza Suite 1230

Irvine, CA 92614

WOOD SMITH HENNING& BERMAN

21804 Cactus Avet Suite 200

Riverside, CA 92518

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED.

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY CALIFORNIA INSURANCE GUARANTEEASSOCIATION.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY CALIFORNIA INSURANCE GUARANTEEASSOCIATION.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

REPLY TO DEFTS TO MOTION RE: DEMURRER SET FOR HEARING ON 04/10/18 FILED BY SHINIH USA, INC., AMERICAN NONWOVENS,INC.. (IMAGED)

REPLY TO DEFTS TO MOTION RE: DEMURRER SET FOR HEARING ON 04/10/18 FILED BY SHINIH USA, INC., AMERICAN NONWOVENS,INC.. (IMAGED)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

MOTION RE: TO QUASH SERVICE OF PROCESS SET FOR HEARING ON 09/04/18, FILED BY DEFENDANT SHINIH ENTERPRISESCO., LTD. (IMAGED)

MOTION RE: TO QUASH SERVICE OF PROCESS SET FOR HEARING ON 09/04/18, FILED BY DEFENDANT SHINIH ENTERPRISESCO., LTD. (IMAGED)

DECLARATION OF FILEMON CARRILLO FILED

DECLARATION OF FILEMON CARRILLO FILED

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO SHINIH ENTERPRISESCO., LTD. SERVED ON 06/08/18 WITH FEES OF $40.62.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO SHINIH ENTERPRISESCO., LTD. SERVED ON 06/08/18 WITH FEES OF $40.62.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF ORDER GRANTING DEMURRER BY MAIL ON 08/08/18 AS TO PLAINTIFFS, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF ORDER GRANTING DEMURRER BY MAIL ON 08/08/18 AS TO PLAINTIFFS, FILED.

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: DEMURRER TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT SET FOR HEARING ON 04/10/18, FILED BY PLAINTIFF EULALIO CHAVEZ (IMAGED)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: DEMURRER TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT SET FOR HEARING ON 04/10/18, FILED BY PLAINTIFF EULALIO CHAVEZ (IMAGED)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: TO QUASH SERVICE OF PROCESS SET FOR HEARING ON 09/04/18, FILED BY PLAINTIFF EULALIO CHAVEZ (IMAGED)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: TO QUASH SERVICE OF PROCESS SET FOR HEARING ON 09/04/18, FILED BY PLAINTIFF EULALIO CHAVEZ (IMAGED)

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 12/01/2016 OF CALIFORNIA INSURANCE GUARANTEEASSOCIATION - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 12/01/2016 OF CALIFORNIA INSURANCE GUARANTEEASSOCIATION - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT SET FOR HEARING ON 07/25/18 FILED BY AMERICAN NONWOVENS,INC.. (IMAGED)

REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT SET FOR HEARING ON 07/25/18 FILED BY AMERICAN NONWOVENS,INC.. (IMAGED)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: DEMURRER TO 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT SET FOR HEARING ON 07/25/18, FILED BY PLAINTIFF EULALIO CHAVEZ (IMAGED)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: DEMURRER TO 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT SET FOR HEARING ON 07/25/18, FILED BY PLAINTIFF EULALIO CHAVEZ (IMAGED)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: DECLARATION ISO MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE SET FOR HEARING ON 09/04/18, FILED BY PLAINTIFF EULALIO CHAVEZ (IMAGED)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: DECLARATION ISO MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE SET FOR HEARING ON 09/04/18, FILED BY PLAINTIFF EULALIO CHAVEZ (IMAGED)

STIPULATION RE: COMPLAINT IN-INTERVENTION FILED.

STIPULATION RE: COMPLAINT IN-INTERVENTION FILED.

NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE FILED BY AMERICAN NONWOVENS,INC..

NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE FILED BY AMERICAN NONWOVENS,INC..

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 12/01/2016 OF CALIFORNIA INSURANCE GUARANTEEASSOCIATION FILED BY CALIFORNIA INSURANCE GUARANTEEASSOCIATION, WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 12/01/2016 OF CALIFORNIA INSURANCE GUARANTEEASSOCIATION FILED BY CALIFORNIA INSURANCE GUARANTEEASSOCIATION, WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; DISMISS COMPLAINT OF CALIFORNIA INSURANCE GUARANTEEASSOCIATION, ON 03/16/18

57 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2018
  • HEARING RE: STATUS CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • HEARING RE: FURTHER TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RULING ON DEMURRER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMO OF COSTS FILED BY SHINIH ENTERPRISES, FOR COSTS $1,105.34.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • MOTION RE: WUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS/SECOND AMENDED CI (8.1.18) FILED BY DEFENDANT VFT INC; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; KEITH D DAVIS, JUDGE; CLERK: VANESKA DIEDERICH; COURT REPORTER TRACI TROLI 13302; COURT ATTENDANT E ROBLES; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY CHRISTOPHER ANDAL PRESENT FOR EULALIO CHAVEZ.; ATTORNEY PHIL CARRILLO PRESENT FOR SHINIH ENTERPRISES, VFT INC, AMERICAN OUTDOOR LIVI.; MOTION; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; VFT INC'S MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS/2ND AMEND C.I. IS HEARD.; COURT RECITES TENTATIVE RULING.; ARGUED BY COUNSEL AND SUBMITTED.; COURT FINDS:; COURT ADOPTS TENTATIVE RULING.; MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS OF THE VFT INC IS GRANTED.; SET ASIDE DISPOSITION OF DEFENDANT VFT INC.; NEW SERVICE REQUIRED ON THE 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT INTERVENTION OF EULALIO CHAVEZ ON DEFENDANT VFT INC; HEARINGS:; HEARING DATE OF 11/08/18 CONFIRMED.; COUNSEL FOR MOVING PARTY TO GIVE NOTICE.; ; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • MOTION RE: DEMURRER (8.1.18) FILED BY DEFENDANT AMERICAN OUTDOOR LIVING INC; Disposition: Sustained; Minutes; KEITH D DAVIS, JUDGE; CLERK: VANESKA DIEDERICH; COURT REPORTER TRACI TROLI 13302; COURT ATTENDANT E ROBLES; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY CHRISTOPHER ANDAL PRESENT FOR EULALIO CHAVEZ.; ATTORNEY PHIL CARRILLO PRESENT FOR SHINISH ENTERPRISES,VFT,AMERICAN OUTDOOR.; MOTION; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; AMERICAN OUTDOOR LIVING INC'S MOTION RE: DEMURRER TO 2ND AMEND CMPLNT-IN-INTERVENTION IS HEARD.; COURT RECITES TENTATIVE RULING.; ARGUED BY COUNSEL AND SUBMITTED.; COURT FINDS:; COURT ADOPTS TENTATIVE RULING.; DEMURRER IS SUSTAINED AS TO AMERICAN OUTDOOR LIVING INC ON 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT INTERVENTION OF EULALIO CHAVEZ , WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND; HEARINGS:; VACATE HRG HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 09/12/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S25.; HEARING RE: STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 11/08/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S25.; COUNSEL FOR AMERICAN OUTDOOR LIVING INC TO GIVE NOTICE.; ; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • MOTION RE: TO QUASH SERVICE OF PROCESS FILED BY DEFENDANT SHINIH ENTERPRISESCO., LTD.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; KEITH D DAVIS, JUDGE; CLERK: VANESKA DIEDERICH; COURT REPORTER TRACI TROLI 13302; COURT ATTENDANT E ROBLES; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY CHRISTOPHER ANDAL PRESENT FOR EULALIO CHAVEZ.; ATTORNEY PHIL CARRILLO PRESENT FOR SHINISH ENTERPRISES, VFT, AMERICAN OUTDOOR.; MOTION; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; SHINIH ENTERPRISESCO., LTD.'S MOTION TO QUASH SUMMONS ON 2ND AMEND C.I. IS HEARD.; COURT RECITES TENTATIVE RULING.; ARGUED BY COUNSEL AND SUBMITTED.; COURT FINDS:; COURT ADOPTS TENTATIVE RULING.; MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS OF THE SHINIH ENTERPRISESCO., LTD. IS GRANTED.; SET ASIDE DISPOSITION OF DEFENDANT SHINIH ENTERPRISESCO., LTD..; NEW SERVICE REQUIRED ON THE 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT INTERVENTION OF EULALIO CHAVEZ ON DEFENDANT SHINIH ENTERPRISESCO., LTD.; HEARINGS:; HEARING DATE OF 11/08/18 CONFIRMED.; COUNSEL FOR MOVING PARTY TO GIVE NOTICE.; ; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REPLY TO VFT INC.S IN INTERVENTION SUPPORT TO MOTION RE: QUASH SERVICE SET FOR HEARING ON 09/04/18 FILED BY VFT INC. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REPLY TO SHINIH ENTERPRISES CO., LTD TO MOTION RE: QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS SET FOR HEARING ON 09/04/18 FILED BY SHINIH ENTERPRISES. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REPLY TO AMERICAN OUTDOOR LIVING INC.S SUPPORT TO MOTION RE: DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT SET FOR HEARING ON 09/04/18 FILED BY AMERICAN OUTDOOR LIVING INC. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
92 More Docket Entries
  • 06/09/2017
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; KEITH D DAVIS, JUDGE; CLERK: ILAYALI WADE; COURT REPORTER TRACI TROLI 13302; COURT ATTENDANT E ROBLES; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY MICHAEL K. MCKIBBIN PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; ATTORNEY CHRISTOPHER N. ANDALL APPEARS BY COURT CALL.; (FOR INTERVENOR: EULALIO CHAVEZ); PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL.; REASON: TO ALLOW DEFENSE COUNSEL TO INTERVENE.; DEFENSE COUNSEL INTENDS TO FILE A COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION WITHIN THE NEXT WEEK OR TWO.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 09/07/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S25.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 12/01/2016 OF CALIFORNIA INSURANCE GUARANTEEASSOCIATION - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CALIFORNIA INSURANCE GUARANTEEASSOCIATION FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 161201-0723 $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • PLAINTIFF CALIFORNIA INSURANCE GUARANTEEASSOCIATION FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • ADVANCED JURY FEES POSTED FOR CALIFORNIA INSURANCE GUARANTEEASSOCIATION.; Minutes; Receipt: 161201-0724 $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S25

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.