This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/03/2021 at 03:26:29 (UTC).

CALIFORNIA BUSINESS -V- LIRA

Case Summary

On 12/31/2019 CALIFORNIA BUSINESS filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against LIRA. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0250

  • Filing Date:

    12/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BUREAU INC.

CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BUREAU INC.A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

EMILIA ESPARZA

JOSE LIRA

LIRA, JOSE

ESPARZA, EMILIA

Not Yet Classified

CONV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FRANKLIN J LOVE

800 So Barranca Ave #100

Covina, CA 91723

Love, Calvin F

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

10/26/2020: NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF ABSTRACT SENT. ABSTRACT IS RETURNED BY T

06/22/2020: NOTICE OF ABSTRACT SENT. ABSTRACT IS RETURNED BY T

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING FRANK

06/22/2020: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING FRANK

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT RETURNED AND FILED.

03/10/2020: NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT RETURNED AND FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT SERVED ON

03/10/2020: PROOF OF SERVICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT SERVED ON

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

02/01/2020: NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

CERTIFIED COPY OF JUDGMENT FILED ON 01-08-10 (IMAG

12/31/2019: CERTIFIED COPY OF JUDGMENT FILED ON 01-08-10 (IMAG

MEMO OF COSTS FILED BY CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BUREAU

12/31/2019: MEMO OF COSTS FILED BY CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BUREAU

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. COPY FILED.

12/31/2019: NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. COPY FILED.

RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED. ORIGINAL JUDGMENT ENTER

12/31/2019: RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED. ORIGINAL JUDGMENT ENTER

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Return of Document(s); Comment: NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketDocument is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):; Comment: ABSTRACT IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): TWO CASES AND CHECK FOR CIVDS2003837 CORRECT AND RETURN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • FinancialCONV; Counter Payment; Receipt # 20201006-0411; ConversionPayment; $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment Issued; Comment: ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED 201006-0411-CK MJX/ 40.00 PAYMT 201006-0411-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 091852

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Sent re:; Comment: NOTICE OF ABSTRACT SENT. ABSTRACT IS RETURNED BY THE COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON: JUDGMENT AMOUNT DOES NOT MATCH COURT RECORDS. SEE ATTACHMENT, CORRECT AND RESUBMIT. THANK YOU.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney Filed; Comment: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING FRANKLIN LOVE WITH CALVIN LOVE AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BUREAU INC..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketService type not specified; Anticipated Server; Anticipated Method; Served: 03/10/2020; Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT SERVED ON 03/05/20.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Renewal of Judgment Returned and Filed; Comment: NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT RETURNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Renewal of Judgment Filed; Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT SERVED ON 03/05/20.

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/08/2020
  • FinancialCONV; Counter Payment; Receipt # 20200108-0752; ConversionPayment; $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DispositionJudgment; Judgment Type: Renewal of Judgment; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To: CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BUREAU INC.A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; Awarded Against; ESPARZA, EMILIA; LIRA, JOSE; Amount; Damages: $0.00; Pre-Judgment Interest: $4,305.75; Attorney Fees: $0.00; Costs: $30.00; Other: $4,310.47; Other Comment: Principle; Total: $8646.22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • FinancialCONV; Total Financial Assessment: $70.00; Total Payments and Credits: $70.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComment: (Imaged); Comment: CERTIFIED COPY OF JUDGMENT FILED ON 01/08/10 (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: FILING FEE PAID BY CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BUREAU INC. FOR ROJ 200108-0752-CK MFF/ 30.00 PAYMT 200108-0752-CK REFERENCE NUMBER CK 3148

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs; Comment: MEMO OF COSTS FILED BY CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BUREAU INC., FOR INTEREST: 4305.75.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Renewal of Judgment Issued. Copy Filed; Comment: NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. COPY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRenewal of Judgment Filed; Comment: RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED. ORIGINAL JUDGMENT ENTERED 01/08/10 IS ORDERED RENEWED AS FOLLOWS: IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED THAT CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BUREAU INC. HAVE & RECOVER FROM JOSE LIRA, EMILIA ESPARZA: JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $4,310.47 INTEREST $4,305.75 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $30.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00. JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $8646.22 STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OTHER CLERK JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OTHER CLERK JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketApplication and Order for Renewal of Judgment Filed; Comment: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONV is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BUREAU INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOVE, FRANKLIN J