This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 09:46:24 (UTC).

CALIFORNIA BUSINESS -V- DELAMORA

Case Summary

On 10/11/2017 CALIFORNIA BUSINESS filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DELAMORA. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9976

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BUREAU INC.

Defendants

STEVEN D DELAMORA

SHANNON DELAMORA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRANKLIN J LOVE

800 So Barranca Ave #100

Covina, CA 91723

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION RE: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY CALIFORNIA BUSINESSBUREAU INC.

DECLARATION RE: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY CALIFORNIA BUSINESSBUREAU INC.

SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON REDUCED COLLECTIONS FILED 10/11/2017 OF CALIFORNIA BUSINESSBUREAU INC. ORDERED ENTERED 12/13/17; JUDGMENT FOR: CALIFORNIA BUSINESSBUREAU INC.; JUDGMENT AGAINST: STEVEN D DELAMORA, SHANNON DELAMORA; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $4,697.12 INTEREST $823.04 ATTORNEY FEES $619.00 COSTS $327.40 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $6,466.56; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

DECLARATION RE: IN SUPPORT OF ATTNY FEES FILED BY CALIFORNIA BUSINESSBUREAU INC.

DECLARATION RE: IN SUPPORT OF ATTNY FEES FILED BY CALIFORNIA BUSINESSBUREAU INC.

COMPUTATION OF INTEREST FILED.

COMPUTATION OF INTEREST FILED.

DECLARATION RE: 1033 CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE FILED BY CALIFORNIA BUSINESSBUREAU INC.

DECLARATION RE: 1033 CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE FILED BY CALIFORNIA BUSINESSBUREAU INC.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON STEVEN D DELAMORA, SHANNON DELAMORA.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON STEVEN D DELAMORA, SHANNON DELAMORA.

DISMISSAL FILED ON REDUCED COLLECTIONS FILED 10/11/2017 OF CALIFORNIA BUSINESSBUREAU INC. AS TO DOES ONLY

DISMISSAL FILED ON REDUCED COLLECTIONS FILED 10/11/2017 OF CALIFORNIA BUSINESSBUREAU INC. AS TO DOES ONLY

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO STEVEN D DELAMORA SERVED ON 10/23/17 WITH FEES OF $78.45.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO STEVEN D DELAMORA SERVED ON 10/23/17 WITH FEES OF $78.45.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO SHANNON DELAMORA SERVED ON 10/22/17 WITH FEES OF $52.95.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO SHANNON DELAMORA SERVED ON 10/22/17 WITH FEES OF $52.95.

DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES BP6322.1(C)(1) FILED.

DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES BP6322.1(C)(1) FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).

COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED FULLY SATISFIED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY ( 6826.54 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CALIFORNIA BUSINESSBUREAU INC. FOR WRIT OF EXECUTION FOR LA COUNTY; Minutes; Receipt: 180413-0268 $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $136.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $198.98)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CALIFORNIA BUSINESSBUREAU INC. FOR ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 180130-0118 $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY CALIFORNIA BUSINESSBUREAU INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON REDUCED COLLECTIONS FILED 10/11/2017 OF CALIFORNIA BUSINESSBUREAU INC. ORDERED ENTERED 12/13/17; JUDGMENT FOR: CALIFORNIA BUSINESSBUREAU INC.; JUDGMENT AGAINST: STEVEN D DELAMORA, SHANNON DELAMORA; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $4,697.12 INTEREST $823.04 ATTORNEY FEES $619.00 COSTS $327.40 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $6,466.56; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 10/11/2017
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $4,697.12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • PRAYER FOR INTEREST PERCENTAGE RATE OF 10 PER ANNUM BEGINNING DATE OF 03/05/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • PLAINTIFF CALIFORNIA BUSINESSBUREAU INC. FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CALIFORNIA BUSINESSBUREAU INC. FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 171012-0696 $196.00; 171012-0696-CK Reference Number 086389

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.