This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 03/14/2017 at 13:31:32 (UTC).

CALI V SMITH

Case Summary

On 12/14/2016 CALI filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SMITH. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8726

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALDO CALI

Defendants

ANNETTE SMITH

ERIK SMITH

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROSENTHAL, LISA F

22736 Vanowen St Ste300

West Hills, CA 91307

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( WRIT PLACED IN ATY BIN)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( WRIT PLACED IN ATY BIN); Minutes; Receipt: 170125-0791 $25.00

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 161214-0184 $255.00; 161214-0184-CK Reference Number 2035

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO ANNETTE SMITH SERVED ON 12/21/16 WITH COSTS OF $65.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO ANNETTE SMITH SERVED ON 12/21/16 WITH COSTS OF $65.00 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO ERIK SMITH SERVED ON 12/21/16 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO ERIK SMITH SERVED ON 12/21/16 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 12/21/16 WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 12/21/16 WITH FEES OF $0.00.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON ANNETTE SMITH, ERIK SMITH, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON ANNETTE SMITH, ERIK SMITH, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 12/14/2016 OF ALDO CALI ORDERED ENTERED 01/12/17; JUDGMENT FOR: ALDO CALI; JUDGMENT AGAINST: ANNETTE SMITH, ERIK SMITH, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: ANNETTE SMITH, ERIK SMITH, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ANNETTE SMITH, ERIK SMITH FOR COPIES; Minutes; Receipt: 170310-0317 $7.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( WRIT PLACED IN ATY BIN); Minutes; Receipt: 170125-0791 $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • 712/WRIT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • DEFAULT/JUDGMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 12/14/2016 OF ALDO CALI ORDERED ENTERED 01/12/17; JUDGMENT FOR: ALDO CALI; JUDGMENT AGAINST: ANNETTE SMITH, ERIK SMITH, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: ANNETTE SMITH, ERIK SMITH, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON ANNETTE SMITH, ERIK SMITH, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 12/14/2016 OF ALDO CALI AS TO ANNETTE SMITH, ERIK SMITH, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • POS RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 12/21/16 WITH FEES OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • ON THE UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 12/14/2016 OF ALDO CALI, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS IS ADDED AS A DEF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO ERIK SMITH SERVED ON 12/21/16 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO ANNETTE SMITH SERVED ON 12/21/16 WITH COSTS OF $65.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $750.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $25.00.--BEGINNING ON 01/01/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT F8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 161214-0184 $255.00; 161214-0184-CK Reference Number 2035

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.