This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/10/2018 at 01:16:26 (UTC).

CAHAN VS DIRECTV, INC

Case Summary

On 11/23/2016 CAHAN filed an Other lawsuit against DIRECTV, INC. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0104

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOHN CAHAN

Defendants

DIRECTV, INC

ALORICA, INC

DIRECTV, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOLDEN & CARDONA-LOYA, LLP

3130 Bonita Road, Suite 200-B

Chula Vista, CA 91910

Defendant Attorney

AT&T SERVIVES LEGAL DEPARTMENT

7337 Trade Street Suite 3549

San Diego, CA 92121

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 161128-0797 $435.00

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 161128-0797 $435.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL BY MAIL SVC ON 04/09/18 AS TO ATTY FOR DEF, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL BY MAIL SVC ON 04/09/18 AS TO ATTY FOR DEF, FILED.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

NOTICE OF HEARING SENT.

NOTICE OF HEARING SENT.; Minutes; BE ADVISED, A HEARING RE: STATUS OF REMOVAL HAS BEEN SET FOR 4/16/18 AT 8:30AM IN DEPARTMENT; S24.; NOTICES PRINTED

NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT FILED BY ALORICA, INC. FEDERAL NUMBER UNKNOWN.

NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT FILED BY ALORICA, INC. FEDERAL NUMBER UNKNOWN.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF STIP/ORDR TO GRANT PLA TO FILE FIRST AMENDED BY MAIL ON 08/24/17 AS TO ATTORNEYS FOR DIRECTV, LLC, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF STIP/ORDR TO GRANT PLA TO FILE FIRST AMENDED BY MAIL ON 08/24/17 AS TO ATTORNEYS FOR DIRECTV, LLC, FILED.

AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF JOHN CAHAN

AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF JOHN CAHAN

PROOF OF SERVICE OF DIRECTV, LLCS NTC OF PAYMENT OF ADVANCE JURY FEE BY MAIL ON 05/24/17 AS TO PLAINTIFFS ATTORNEY, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF DIRECTV, LLCS NTC OF PAYMENT OF ADVANCE JURY FEE BY MAIL ON 05/24/17 AS TO PLAINTIFFS ATTORNEY, FILED.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY JOHN CAHAN.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY JOHN CAHAN.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF DIRECTV, LLCS ANSWER TO COMPLAINT BY US MAIL ON 03/23/17 AS TO PLAINTIFFS ATTORNEY, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF DIRECTV, LLCS ANSWER TO COMPLAINT BY US MAIL ON 03/23/17 AS TO PLAINTIFFS ATTORNEY, FILED.

ANSWER FILED BY DIRECTV, LLC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY AT&T SERVIVES LEGALDEPARTMENT.

ANSWER FILED BY DIRECTV, LLC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY AT&T SERVIVES LEGALDEPARTMENT.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON DIRECTV, INC; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/05/17 WITH COSTS OF $169.95 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON DIRECTV, INC; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/05/17 WITH COSTS OF $169.95 FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2018
  • HEARING RE: STATUS OF REMOVAL; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL BY MAIL SVC ON 04/09/18 AS TO ATTY FOR DEF, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • READINESS CALENDAR; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • VOLUNTARY CIVIL MEDIATION SESSION; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • VACATE VCMS HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 12/14/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S34.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • VACATE READI HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 04/05/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S24.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • VACATE JT HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 04/09/18 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT S24.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING SENT.; Minutes; BE ADVISED, A HEARING RE: STATUS OF REMOVAL HAS BEEN SET FOR 4/16/18 AT 8:30AM IN DEPARTMENT; S24.; NOTICES PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2017
  • DIRECTV, LLCS ANSWER IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): FILING FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00 DUE WITH THIS FILING. $240.00 PROVIDED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON DIRECTV, INC; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/05/17 WITH COSTS OF $169.95 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY JOHN CAHAN FOR FAX FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 161128-0807 $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 161128-0797 $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.