This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/11/2018 at 23:02:30 (UTC).

CACH -V- PEREZ

Case Summary

On 05/04/2011 CACH filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PEREZ. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5800

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CACH LLC

Defendant

VANESSA PEREZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

NEUHEISEL LAW FIRM,P.C.

2277 Fair Oaks Blvd. Suite 305A

Sacramento, CA 95825

GURSTEL LAW FIRM, P.C.

9320 East Raintree Drive

Scottsdale, AZ 85260

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2018
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY ( 9200.98 ); Minutes; Receipt: 180710-0928 $25.00; 180710-0928-CK Reference Number 115906

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $499.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $3,546.46)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OF NEUHEISEL LAW FIRM,P.C. FOR CACH LLC CHANGES ITS NAME TO GURSTEL LAW FIRM, P.C. FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT (IN THE AMOUNT OF $3,002.27) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM SACRAMENTO COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $25.46.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2015
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY ( $7685.07 ); Minutes; Receipt: 150623-2000 $25.00; 150623-2000-CK Reference Number 39475

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2015
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SACRAMENTO COUNTY ( $7685.07 ); Minutes; Receipt: 150623-1982 $25.00; 150623-1982-CK Reference Number 39476

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2015
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT (IN THE AMOUNT OF $2,947.73) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2015
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $499.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,976.01)

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 07/22/2011
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST VANESSA PEREZ FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2011
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/04/2011 OF CACH LLC AS TO VANESSA PEREZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2011
  • DECLARATION OF CCP 1033 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2011
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/04/2011 OF CACH LLC FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/04/2011 OF CACH LLC ORDERED ENTERED 07/22/11; JUDGMENT FOR: CACH LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: VANESSA PEREZ; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $6,254.52 INTEREST $772.82 ATTORNEY FEES $775.45 COSTS $330.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $8,132.79; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2011
  • VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 11/04/11 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S34.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2011
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO VANESSA PEREZ SERVED ON 05/17/11 WITH FEES OF $90.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CASE AND PARTY INFORMATION ADDED; Minutes; Receipt: 110504-2253 $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S34

    Read MoreRead Less