This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/11/2018 at 23:01:20 (UTC).

CACH -V- LAVINGIA

Case Summary

On 05/04/2011 CACH filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LAVINGIA. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5795

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CACH LLC

Defendant

PANKAJ R LAVINGIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANDARICH LAW GROUP LLP

420 N. Wabash Ave Suite 400

Chicago, IL 60611

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2016
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA COUNTY ( $39,326.57 ); Minutes; Receipt: 160524-0796 $25.00; 160524-0796-CK Reference Number 024552

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $12,685.01)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2015
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE ADDRESS FILED BY CACH LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2012
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2011
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2011
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/04/2011 OF CACH LLC FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/04/2011 OF CACH LLC ORDERED ENTERED 07/21/11; JUDGMENT FOR: CACH LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: PANKAJ R LAVINGIA; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $22,271.03 INTEREST $2,037.40 ATTORNEY FEES $1,868.13 COSTS $440.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $26,616.56; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2011
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2011
  • DECLARATION RE: ACCRUED INTEREST & ATTNY FEES FILED BY CACH LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2011
  • DECLARATION RE: ACCEPTING COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS FILED BY CACH LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2011
  • DECLARATION RE: COMPLIANCE WITH CCP 1033 FILED BY CACH LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2011
  • DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/04/2011 OF CACH LLC AS TO DOES ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2011
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2011
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST PANKAJ R LAVINGIA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2011
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/04/2011 OF CACH LLC AS TO PANKAJ R LAVINGIA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2011
  • VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 11/04/11 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S33.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON PANKAJ R LAVINGIA; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 05/07/11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CASE AND PARTY INFORMATION ADDED; Minutes; Receipt: 110504-2041 $380.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S33

    Read MoreRead Less