This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/14/2016 at 09:58:51 (UTC).

CACH -V- BILLY SMITH

Case Summary

On 05/04/2011 CACH filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BILLY SMITH. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4510

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CACH LLC

Defendant

BILLY SMITH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF ROBERT J COLCLOUGH, III

9301 Oakdale Ave Ste 205

Chatsworth, CA 91311

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2015
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $30.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2012
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2012
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY ( 11310.97 ); Minutes; Receipt: 120112-0827$25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2011
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2011
  • CASE SENT TO JUDGMENT SHELF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2011
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/04/2011 OF CACH LLC FILED; Minutes; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST BILLY SMITH.; IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED THAT CACH LLC HAVE &; RECOVER FROM BILLY SMITH:; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $9,521.61 INTEREST $1,503.36 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $261.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $11,285.97; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2011
  • DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/04/2011 OF CACH LLC AS TO DOES ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2011
  • DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2011
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2011
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON BILLY SMITH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2011
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/04/2011 OF CACH LLC AS TO BILLY SMITH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2011
  • VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 10/26/11 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT R8.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF S&C FILED AS TO BILLY SMITH. PARTY SERVED ON 07/06/11. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $65.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • DECLARATION OF ROBERT J COLCLOUGH, III FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • DECLARATION RE: UNDER B&P CODE 6322.1 FILED BY CACH LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT R8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CASE AND PARTY INFORMATION ADDED; Minutes; Receipt: 110504-0807$196.00

    Read MoreRead Less