This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 18:24:43 (UTC).

CABRERA VS GOMEZ

Case Summary

On 08/21/2015 CABRERA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GOMEZ. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6653

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Others

JESUS CABRERA

AL GOMEZ

Defendant and Other

AL GOMEZ

 

Court Documents

IMAGED DOCUMENTS PREVIOUSLY FILED.

IMAGED DOCUMENTS PREVIOUSLY FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED.

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED.

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Pre-D Complete

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 01:38; CHARLES J UMEDA, JUDGE; CLERK: JERI MILLER; BAILIFF: D FERRIS; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF JESUS CABRERA PRESENT; DEFENDANT AL GOMEZ PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; SMALL CLAIMS REFERRAL TO MEDIATION; AFTER MEDIATION, MATTER IS NOT SETTLED.; WITNESS -- JESUS CABRERA IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; WITNESS -- AL GOMEZ IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; COURT WILL GIVE THE DEFENDANT UNTIL 10/16/2015 TO SUBMIT AN ENUMERATION; OF ITEMIZED REPAIRS; DAVID GOMEZ IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR DEFENDANT.; GUSTAVO CORRAL IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR DEFENDANT.; WITNESS -- AL GOMEZ IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; MATTER DEEMED SUBMITTED.; 03:01; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

CLAIM OF DEFENDANT FILED BY AL GOMEZ (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF DEFENDANT FILED BY AL GOMEZ (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 150923-2102 $30.00; 150923-2102-CK Reference Number 1078

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC-100 FILED AS TO AL GOMEZ. PARTY SERVED ON 09/01/15. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $75.00. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC-100 FILED AS TO AL GOMEZ. PARTY SERVED ON 09/01/15. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $75.00. (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 150821-1466 $30.00; 150821-1466-MC Reference Number 027-0236036357

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2016
  • CK 3620011493 SENT TO JESUS CABRERA $860.86

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • JUDGMNET CREDITORS REQUEST FOR FUNDS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • IMAGED DOCUMENTS PREVIOUSLY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • NOTICE PREPARED FRO REQUEST FOR FUNDS SENT TO FISCAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL JUDGMENT CREDITORS REQUEST FOR FUNDS TO COUNSEL OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • NOTICE JUDGMENT SENT TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • RQST TO PAY JUDGMENT FILED BY AL GOMEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • BAIL RCPT #20151113-3219

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2015
  • RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment; Minutes; CHARLES J UMEDA, JUDGE; CLERK: JERI MILLER; COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS ON SUBMITTED MATTER:; AS TO THE PLAINTIFFS CLAIM; JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED) FILED 08/21/2015 OF JESUS CABRERA ORDERED ENTERED 10/19/15; JUDGMENT FOR: JESUS CABRERA; JUDGMENT AGAINST: AL GOMEZ; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $750.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $105.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $855.00; AS TO THE DEFENDANTS CLAIM; JUDGMENT ON DEFENDANT'S CLAIM FILED 09/23/2015 OF AL GOMEZ ORDERED ENTERED 10/19/15; JUDGMENT FOR: AL GOMEZ; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JESUS CABRERA; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $150.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $30.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $180.00; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • EXHIBITS (RECEIPTS) DROPPED OF BY ALBERT GOMEZ RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 01:38; CHARLES J UMEDA, JUDGE; CLERK: JERI MILLER; BAILIFF: D FERRIS; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF JESUS CABRERA PRESENT; DEFENDANT AL GOMEZ PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; SMALL CLAIMS REFERRAL TO MEDIATION; AFTER MEDIATION, MATTER IS NOT SETTLED.; WITNESS -- JESUS CABRERA IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; WITNESS -- AL GOMEZ IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; COURT WILL GIVE THE DEFENDANT UNTIL 10/16/2015 TO SUBMIT AN ENUMERATION; OF ITEMIZED REPAIRS; DAVID GOMEZ IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR DEFENDANT.; GUSTAVO CORRAL IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR DEFENDANT.; WITNESS -- AL GOMEZ IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; MATTER DEEMED SUBMITTED.; 03:01; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF DEFENDANT FILED BY AL GOMEZ (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 150923-2102 $30.00; 150923-2102-CK Reference Number 1078

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC-100 FILED AS TO AL GOMEZ. PARTY SERVED ON 09/01/15. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $75.00. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • FILING FEE PAID BY JESUS CABRERA FOR COPY; Minutes; Receipt: 150821-1469 $2.50; 150821-1469-MC Reference Number 027-0236036357

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 150821-1466 $30.00; 150821-1466-MC Reference Number 027-0236036357

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.