This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/07/2018 at 15:37:26 (UTC).

CABICO -V- RUBIO

Case Summary

On 02/06/2017 CABICO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against RUBIO. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1046

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEANDRO CABICO

Defendant

STEVE RUBIO

 

Court Documents

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000(IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000(IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 170206-0842 $75.00; 170206-0842-DB Reference Number 025-0066531190

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING (RESET); Disposition: REQ FOR DSMSL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); Minutes; LYNN PONCIN, JUDGE; CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL; BAILIFF: S WADDY; PROCEEDINGS:; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: LEANDRO CABICO; DEFENDANT STEVE RUBIO PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:24; ON COURTS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: NO APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSECUTION (SC); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSECUTION (SC); 10:25; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO STEVE RUBIO. PARTY SERVED ON 04/13/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000(IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 170206-0842 $75.00; 170206-0842-DB Reference Number 025-0066531190

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.