This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/08/2018 at 09:55:22 (UTC).

CABANLIT -V- VITRO et al

Case Summary

On 11/07/2012 CABANLIT filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against VITRO. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Joshua Tree District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0643

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Joshua Tree District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WARREN CABANLIT

JAQUALYNN CABANLIT

Defendants and Cross Defendants

MATTHEW VITRO

NORMA VITRO

DESERT REALTY GROUP INC

KENNETH COX

PURPLE MOUNTAIN LLC

J & K D INC.,

MICHAEL DUNCAN

MICHAEL G DUNCAN

JULIE DUNCAN

J & K D INC.

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

KENNETH COX

PURPLE MOUNTAIN, LLC

MICHAEL DUNCAN

DESERT REALTY GROUP, INC

J & K D, INC

J & KD, INC.

JULIE DUNCAN

J & K D INC.

6 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BINDER & ASSOCIATES

251 South Lake Ave Suite 920

Pasadena, CA 91101

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICE OF ROBERT A WALKER

10370 Hemet Street, Suite 140

Riverside, CA 92503-4103

KINKLE RODIGER & SPRIGGS

3333 Fourteenth Street

Riverside, CA 92501

CARLSON LAW GROUP

21031 Ventura Blvd Ste 1100

Woodland Hills, CA 91364

Cross Defendant Attorney

WALKER, ROBERT A

10370 Hemet St Suite 140

Riverside, CA 92503-4103

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2013
  • CREDIT CARD TRANSACTION ID NUMBER 027-0061711129

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2013
  • NOTICE OF RULING ON 7/11/2013 HEARING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2013
  • FILING FEE PAID BY DESERT REALTY GROUP, INC FOR FAX FILING FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 130730-0216 $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2013
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2013
  • REQ FOR DISM RCVD 7/5 IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): CASE DISMISSED ON 7/11.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2013
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2013
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: VACATED; Minutes; DAVID COHN, JUDGE; CLERK: GAIL ANDERSON; COURT REPORTER REGINA VEGA 12612; COURT ATTENDANT R BRUCATO; ATTORNEY INFORMATION; PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL NOT PRESENT.; ATTORNEY WILLIS KING III PRESENT FOR DEFENDANTS VITRO.; ATTORNEY TREVOR DEBUS PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT DESERT REALTY GROUP INC.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; HAVING NO APPEARANCES IN OPPOSITION, THE COURT PROCEEDS WITH DISMISSAL ORDER PURSUANT TO; NOTICED SETTLEMENT.; NOTICE TO BE GIVEN BY ATY DEBUS.; SUBSEQUENT TO THE HEARING, THE COURT RECEIVES A WRITTEN REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FORM FROM; PLAINTIFF/XDEFENDANT COX WHICH COMPLETES DISPOSITION OF ENTIRE ACTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2013
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): NEED SIGNATURE OF OTHER ATTORNEY TO DISMISS AS TO THE ENTIRE ACTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2013
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2013
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 02/27/2013 OF DESERT REALTY GROUP, INC FILED BY DESERT REALTY GROUP, INC, WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; DISMISS COMPLAINT OF DESERT REALTY GROUP, INC, ON 06/07/13

    Read MoreRead Less
95 More Docket Entries
  • 11/21/2012
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT NAMING DOES NUMBER 1 TO BE J & K D INC DBA TRIAD REALTORS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2012
  • ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 11/07/2012 OF WARREN CABANLIT FOR DESERT REALTY GROUPINC, ADD TRIAD REALTORS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2012
  • PARTIES REFERRED TO ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2012
  • ADA MEMO ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2012
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2012
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2012
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2012
  • FILING FEE PAID BY WARREN CABANLIT FOR FIRST PAPER FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 121107-2206 $435.00; 121107-2206-CK Reference Number 5439

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2012
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT M4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2012
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.