This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 07:38:05 (UTC).

CABANILLA -V- DEUTSCHE BANK, ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/12/2016 CABANILLA filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against DEUTSCHE BANK. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7383

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

WILEHADO T CABANILLA

Defendants and Respondents

QUALITY LOAN SERVICE CORPORATION

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST

WELLS FARGO BANK

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY, AS

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.'S

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

SEVERSON & WERSON

19100 Von Karman Avenue Suite 700

Irvine, CA 92612

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS COMPLAINT FILED AS TO WELLS FARGO BANK. PARTY SERVED ON 07/19/16. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS COMPLAINT FILED AS TO WELLS FARGO BANK. PARTY SERVED ON 07/19/16. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 08/23/16 WITH COSTS OF $55.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 08/23/16 WITH COSTS OF $55.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS COMPLAINT FILED AS TO WELLS FARGO BANK. PARTY SERVED ON 07/19/16. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS COMPLAINT FILED AS TO WELLS FARGO BANK. PARTY SERVED ON 07/19/16. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

ANSWER FILED BY DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY, AS, WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.'S; PARTY REPRESENTED BY SEVERSON & WERSON.

ANSWER FILED BY DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY, AS, WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.'S; PARTY REPRESENTED BY SEVERSON & WERSON.

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OF EX PARTE DOCUMENTS FILED.

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OF EX PARTE DOCUMENTS FILED.

ORDER, APPEAL DISMISSED PLACED IN FILE

ORDER, APPEAL DISMISSED PLACED IN FILE

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OF EX PARTE DOCUMENTS FILED.

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OF EX PARTE DOCUMENTS FILED.

ORDER, APPEAL DISMISSED PLACED IN FILE

ORDER, APPEAL DISMISSED PLACED IN FILE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 08/23/16 WITH COSTS OF $55.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 08/23/16 WITH COSTS OF $55.00 FILED.

COURTS RULING 2/26/18 MOTION TO STRIKE FILED.

COURTS RULING 2/26/18 MOTION TO STRIKE FILED.

NOTICE OF QUALITYS DECLARATION OF NON-MONETARY STATUS FILED BY QUALITY LOAN SERVICE CORPORATION.

NOTICE OF QUALITYS DECLARATION OF NON-MONETARY STATUS FILED BY QUALITY LOAN SERVICE CORPORATION.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCION SET FOR HEARING ON 09/19/16, FILED BY DEFENDANT DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST, WELLS FARGO BANK (IMAGED)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCION SET FOR HEARING ON 09/19/16, FILED BY DEFENDANT DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST, WELLS FARGO BANK (IMAGED)

DECLARATION OF QUALITYS NON-MONETARY STATUS FILED

DECLARATION OF QUALITYS NON-MONETARY STATUS FILED

ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL PRIOR TO CERTIFICATION FILED.

ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL PRIOR TO CERTIFICATION FILED.

CLERK'S NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL DEFAULT FOR APPELLANT DESIGNATIONS. FILED.

CLERK'S NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL DEFAULT FOR APPELLANT DESIGNATIONS. FILED.

NOTICE OF COST TO PREPARE CLERK'S/REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPTS ON APPEAL FILED AND COPIES MAILED.

NOTICE OF COST TO PREPARE CLERK'S/REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPTS ON APPEAL FILED AND COPIES MAILED.

AMENDED NOTICE OF ESTIMATE OF COSTS COPIED AND MAILED FILED.

AMENDED NOTICE OF ESTIMATE OF COSTS COPIED AND MAILED FILED.

127 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2019
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL DEFAULT FOR APPELLANT DESIGNATIONS. FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • APPEAL PACKET FORWARDED TO THE COURT OF APPEAL ON THIS DATE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTIFICATION OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED AND SENT TO PARTIES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • APPEALS CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL CLERKS NOTIFICATION OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEAL ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF WILEHADO CABANILLA FILED BY WILEHADO T CABANILLA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • NOTICE OF APPEAL FAXED/INTEROFFICE TO APPEALS *

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:00 HOURS.; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • READINESS CALENDAR; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
233 More Docket Entries
  • 06/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • POINTS & AUTHORITIES FILED BY WILEHADO T CABANILLA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF EX PARTE APP FOR TRO FILED BY WILEHADO T CABANILLA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • EX PARTE PETITION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY WILEHADO T CABANILLA FOR EX PARTE MOTION FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 160603-0023 $90.00; 160603-0023-VS Reference Number 023-0259796496

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF WILEHADO CABANILLA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 160512-0535 $435.00; 160512-0535-VS Reference Number 023-0257737156

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.