This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 02:52:17 (UTC).

CABADAS-V-ALMARIO

Case Summary

On 09/14/2017 CABADAS-V-ALMARIO was filed as a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7737

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GAMALIEL FARIAS CABADAS

Defendant

ARMAND AGUILAR ALMARIO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THE LAW OFFICE OF LARRY H. PARKER, INC.

350 San Antonio Drive

Long Beach, CA 90807

Defendant Attorney

BONNIE R. MOSS ANDASSOCIATES

1600 Iowa Avenue Suite 200

Riverside, CA 92507

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY GAMALIEL FARIAS CABADAS.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY GAMALIEL FARIAS CABADAS.

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED.

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO ARMAND AGUILAR ALMARIO SERVED ON 10/07/17 WITH FEES OF $70.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO ARMAND AGUILAR ALMARIO SERVED ON 10/07/17 WITH FEES OF $70.00.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

ANSWER FILED BY ARMAND AGUILAR ALMARIO; PARTY REPRESENTED BY BONNIE R. MOSS ANDASSOCIATES.

ANSWER FILED BY ARMAND AGUILAR ALMARIO; PARTY REPRESENTED BY BONNIE R. MOSS ANDASSOCIATES.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY GAMALIEL FARIAS CABADAS.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY GAMALIEL FARIAS CABADAS.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2019
  • JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • READINESS CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • NOTICE OF RULING ON TSC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MICHAEL A SACHS, JUDGE; CLERK: KIMBERLY HOTCHKISS; COURT REPORTER CRAIG ANDERSON 11800; COURT ATTENDANT M KILGORE; APPEARANCES:; JEFFREY R. BILLINGS APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR GAMALIEL FARIAS CABADAS.; ATTORNEY RAEET D. TADDESSE PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL ADVISES THE COURT WRITTEN DISCOVERY HAS BEEN COMPLETED AND THEY INTEND TO; SCHEDULE DEPOSITIONS.; DEFENSE COUNSEL STATES THEY HAVE REQUESTED SUBPOENAED RECORDS AND INTEND TO SCHEDULE AN IME; OF PLAINTIFF.; JURY DEMANDED BY BOTH PARTIES.; ESTIMATED LENGTH OF TRIAL 5 DAY(S).; "REQUIREMENTS OF TRIAL" HANDED TO ALL PARTIES; HEARINGS:; SET ON TRIAL READINESS/ASSIGNMENT CALENDAR FOR 02/07/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S28; JURY TRIAL SET FOR 02/11/19 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT S28 ESTIMATED DURATION OF 5 DAYS.; COUNSEL FOR DEFENSE COUNSEL TO GIVE NOTICE.; AND PROVIDE REQUIREMENTS OF TRIAL TO PLAINTIFFS; COUNSEL.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY GAMALIEL FARIAS CABADAS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY GAMALIEL FARIAS CABADAS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • ADVANCED JURY FEES POSTED FOR GAMALIEL FARIAS CABADAS.; Minutes; Receipt: 180206-0320 $150.00; 180206-0320-CK Reference Number 340106

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • ADVANCED JURY FEES POSTED FOR ARMAND AGUILAR ALMARIO.; Minutes; Receipt: 171103-0680 $150.00; 171103-0680-CK Reference Number 2703

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • DEFENDANT ARMAND AGUILAR ALMARIO FIRST PAPER FEE PAID IN FULL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ARMAND AGUILAR ALMARIO FOR FIRST APP; Minutes; Receipt: 171103-0677 $435.00; 171103-0677-CK Reference Number 2698

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY ARMAND AGUILAR ALMARIO; PARTY REPRESENTED BY BONNIE R. MOSS ANDASSOCIATES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO ARMAND AGUILAR ALMARIO SERVED ON 10/07/17 WITH FEES OF $70.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY GAMALIEL FARIAS CABADAS FOR FILING FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170914-0562 $435.00; 170914-0562-CK Reference Number 331358

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S28

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less